This case was last updated from PACER on 11/14/2020 at 09:26:35 (UTC).

Collins v. BTS & Sons Associates, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 09/15/2020 Collins filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against BTS Sons Associates, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are J. Randal Hall and Christopher L. Ray. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00089

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Randal Hall

Referral Judge

Christopher L. Ray

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dustin Collins

Defendants

BTS & Sons Associates, Inc

South East Personnel Leasing, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gordon Gerhard Van Remmen, II

Attorney at Hall & Lampros, LLP

400 Galleria Pkwy Se, Suite 1150

Atlanta, GA 30339

Peter Andrew Lampros

Attorney at Hall & Lampros, LLP

400 Galleria Pkwy Se, Suite 1150

Atlanta, GA 30339

Defendant Attorney

Julia Christine Glasgow

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP

55 Ivan Allen Jr. Blvd, Nw, Suite 750

Atlanta, GA 30308

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) RULE 26(f)ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 9/15/20. (wwp) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

#15

(#15) RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Strike #9 MOTION to Dismiss Exhibits filed by South East Personnel Leasing, Inc. (Glasgow, Julia) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#14

(#14) REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by South East Personnel Leasing, Inc. (Glasgow, Julia) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Andrew Lampros on behalf of Dustin Collins (Lampros, Peter) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#10

(#10) Defendant BTS & Sons Associates, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint by BTS & Sons Associates, Inc.(Glasgow, Julia) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

9 #1

Exhibit 1 Clark Declaration

#9

(#9) MOTION to Dismiss by South East Personnel Leasing, Inc. Responses due by 10/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Clark Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 Lamb Declaration)(Glasgow, Julia) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Christine Glasgow on behalf of BTS & Sons Associates, Inc, South East Personnel Leasing, Inc (Glasgow, Julia) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dustin Collins. South East Personnel Leasing, Inc served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/12/2020. (Van Remmen, Gordon) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dustin Collins. BTS & Sons Associates, Inc served on 9/18/2020, answer due 10/9/2020. (Lampros, Peter) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

5 #1

Summons

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to BTS & Sons Associates, Inc, South East Personnel Leasing, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(wwp) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

2 #1

summons

#2

No Description Available

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against BTS & Sons Associates, Inc, South East Personnel Leasing, Inc, filed by Dustin Collins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wwp) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Strike #9 MOTION to Dismiss Exhibits filed by South East Personnel Leasing, Inc. (Glasgow, Julia) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by South East Personnel Leasing, Inc. (Glasgow, Julia) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Andrew Lampros on behalf of Dustin Collins (Lampros, Peter) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Dustin Collins. (Van Remmen, Gordon) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Strike #9 MOTION to Dismiss Exhibits by Dustin Collins. Responses due by 11/6/2020. (Van Remmen, Gordon) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Defendant BTS & Sons Associates, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint by BTS & Sons Associates, Inc.(Glasgow, Julia) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Dismiss by South East Personnel Leasing, Inc. Responses due by 10/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Clark Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 Lamb Declaration)(Glasgow, Julia) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Christine Glasgow on behalf of BTS & Sons Associates, Inc, South East Personnel Leasing, Inc (Glasgow, Julia) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dustin Collins. South East Personnel Leasing, Inc served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/12/2020. (Van Remmen, Gordon) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dustin Collins. BTS & Sons Associates, Inc served on 9/18/2020, answer due 10/9/2020. (Lampros, Peter) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to BTS & Sons Associates, Inc, South East Personnel Leasing, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(wwp) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 26(f)ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 9/15/20. (wwp) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 400.00, receipt number AGASDC-2924230. (wwp) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • Docket(#3) Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (wwp) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against BTS & Sons Associates, Inc, South East Personnel Leasing, Inc, filed by Dustin Collins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wwp) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTH EAST PERSONNEL LEASING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gordon Gerhard Van Remmen