This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/10/2019 at 10:17:22 (UTC).

Collins v. Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/15/2019 Collins filed a Property - Real Property Product Liability lawsuit against Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael M. Anello and Karen S. Crawford. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00688

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Real Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael M. Anello

Referral Judge

Karen S. Crawford

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carrie Collins

Defendants

Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.

DOES 1 through 10

Aurobindo LTD.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Graham Lambert

Attorney at Haffner Law PC

445 South Figueroa Street, Suite 2625

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Defendant Attorneys

Kyle Anthony Fellenz

Attorney at Clark Hill LLP

600 W. Broadway, Suite 500

San Diego, CA 92101-3357

Ernest Frank Koschineg, III

Attorney at Cipriani & Werner, P.C.

450 Sentry Parkway, Suite 200

Blue Bell, PA 19422

Jessica Margaret Heinz

Attorney at Cipriani & Werner, P.C.

450 Sentry Parkway, Suite 200

Blue Bell, PA 19422

Roger G Perkins

Attorney at Morris Polich and Purdy, LLP

One America Plaza, 600 West Broadway, Suite 500

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

#17

#15

14 #3

Exhibit 2

14 #2

Exhibit 1

14 #1

Declaration of Jessica Heinz

6 #8

Proof of Service

6 #7

Exhibit

6 #6

Exhibit

6 #5

Exhibit

6 #4

Exhibit

6 #3

Exhibit

6 #2

Declaration

6 #1

Motion to Stay Proceedings

#6

5 #3

Proof of Service

5 #2

[proposed] order

5 #1

Memo of Points and Authorities

#5

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ANSWER to Complaint (Plaintiff's "Class Action Complaint") by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc..(Perkins, Roger) (rmc). (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Minute Order Taking Motions Under Submission: Defendant's #6 MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Plaintiff's #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court are currently set for hearing on June 24, 2019. The Court finds these matters suitable for determination on the papers and without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1.d.1. Accordingly, no appearances are required and the hearings shall be taken off calendar. SO ORDERED by Judge Michael M. Anello on June 19, 2019. (no document attached) (jb1) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Carrie Collins. (Lambert, Graham) (rmc). (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jessica Heinz, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Fellenz, Kyle) (rmc). (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Carrie Collins. (Lambert, Graham) (rmc). (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • (#12) PRO HAC APPROVED: Ernest Frank Koschineg, III appearing for Defendants Aurobindo LTD., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. (no document attached) (dsn) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • (#11) PRO HAC APPROVED: Jessica Margaret Heinz appearing for Defendants Aurobindo LTD., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. (no document attached) (dsn) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12576043.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Koschineg, Ernest) Modified on 6/4/2019 (dsn). (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12576002.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Heinz, Jessica) (dsn) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER Granting #7 Second Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Upon due consideration and good cause appearing, the Court grants the joint motion. APUSA must file its responsive pleading on or before 6/24/2019. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 5/22/2019. (rmc) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Responsive Pleading by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proof of Service)(Perkins, Roger) Modified to correct event on 5/22/2019 (rmc). (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Stay Proceedings, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Proof of Service)(Perkins, Roger)Attorney Roger G Perkins added to party Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.(pty:dft) (rmc). (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Carrie Collins. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 [proposed] order, #3 Proof of Service)(Lambert, Graham) QC mail sent re e-filed proposed order (rmc). (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER Granting #3 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Upon due consideration and good cause appearing, the Court grants the joint motion. Defendant Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. must file its responsive pleading on or before 5/22/2019. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 4/23/2019. (rmc) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Fellenz, Kyle) Courtesy QC mail sent re e-filed proposed order (rmc). (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. (Notice of Interested Parties). No Parties With Financial Interest. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Fellenz, Kyle) (rmc). (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of CA, San Diego, case number 37-2019-00013178-CU-BT-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12408999.), filed by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration Kyle A. Fellenz, #3 Declaration Hunter Murdock, #4 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:19-cv-688-MMA-KSC. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case.(mme) (sjt). (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Aurobindo USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Graham Lambert