This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/07/2022 at 08:50:28 (UTC).

Collins et al v. Wal-Mart Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/08/2022 Collins filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wal-Mart Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Katherine A Crytzer and Jill E McCook. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00210

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Katherine A Crytzer

Referral Judge

Jill E McCook

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lesa Collins

Tony Collins

Defendants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

Wal-Mart Inc.

Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.

Green Wave Investment Group Ltd. Inc.

Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust

Defendant and 3Rd Party Defendant

Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gabriel Charles Stapleton

Attorney at The Terry Law Firm

116 East Main Street, P.O. Box 724

Morristown, TN 37815-0724

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

George A Rowlett

Attorney at Howell & Fisher PLLC

3310 West End Avenue, Suite 550

Nashville, TN 37203-1089

Elle G Kern

Attorney at Howell & Fisher PLLC

3310 West End Avenue, Suite 550

Nashville, TN 37203-1089

Andrew Jordan Lewis

Attorney at Law Office of Gary R Wilkinson

51 Century Blvd, Suite 300

Nashville, TN 37214

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, filed by Green Wave Investment Group Ltd. Inc..(Lewis, Andrew) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

12 #1

Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent

12 #12

Main Document

#11

(#11) ANSWER to Complaint by Green Wave Investment Group Ltd. Inc..(Lewis, Andrew) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

#10

(#10) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Green Wave Investment Group Ltd. Inc.. (Lewis, Andrew) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

#8

(#8) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Green Wave Investment Group Ltd. Inc.. (Lewis, Andrew) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Jordan Lewis on behalf of Green Wave Investment Group Ltd. Inc. (Lewis, Andrew) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

#6

(#6) Defendant Wal-Mart, Inc.'s and Defendant Wal-Mart Stores East, LP's ANSWER to Complaint by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P..(Kern, Elle) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

#5

(#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 6/8/22. (ABF) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 6/8/22. (ABF) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

#3

(#3) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 6/8/22. (ABF) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Walmart Inc. for Wal-Mart Inc.. (Kern, Elle) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

1 #5

Other Notice of filing notice of removal

1 #4

Exhibit C-Affidavit of Service

1 #3

Exhibit B-Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit A-Summons

1 #1

Other Civil cover sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, filed by Green Wave Investment Group Ltd. Inc..(Lewis, Andrew) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 7/21/22. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint by Green Wave Investment Group Ltd. Inc..(Lewis, Andrew) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Green Wave Investment Group Ltd. Inc.. (Lewis, Andrew) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Defendant Green Wave Investment Group, LTD, SHALL file its response to the Complaint on or before July 22, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E. McCook on 7/20/2022. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Green Wave Investment Group Ltd. Inc.. (Lewis, Andrew) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Jordan Lewis on behalf of Green Wave Investment Group Ltd. Inc. (Lewis, Andrew) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Defendant Wal-Mart, Inc.'s and Defendant Wal-Mart Stores East, LP's ANSWER to Complaint by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P..(Kern, Elle) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 6/8/22. (ABF) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 6/8/22. (ABF) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 6/8/22. (ABF) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketDistrict Judge Katherine A Crytzer and Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook added. (ABF) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Walmart Inc. for Wal-Mart Inc.. (Kern, Elle) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Claiborne County, TN, case number CV2303. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-5081627), filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Wal-Mart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Summons, #3 Exhibit B-Complaint, #4 Exhibit C-Affidavit of Service, #5 Other Notice of filing notice of removal)(Kern, Elle) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Wal-Mart is a litigant