This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/20/2020 at 07:11:31 (UTC).

Collins et al v. Sonic Corp

Case Summary

On 10/21/2020 Collins filed an Other lawsuit against Sonic Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jodi W. Dishman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-01067

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jodi W. Dishman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Danny Collins

Defendant

Sonic Corp a Delaware Corporation doing business as Sonic Drive-In

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew J Shamis

Attorney at Shamis & Gentile PA

14 Ne 1St Ave, Suite 1205

Miami, FL 33132

Scott A Edelsberg

Attorney at Edelsberg Law

20900 Ne 30Th Ave, Suite 417

Aventura, FL 33180

Defendant Attorney

Erick Wilbert Harris

101 Park Avenue, Suite 1300

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

5 #1

Attachment Form Motion for PHV

5 #2

Attachment Admissions List

5 #3

Attachment Proposed Order

#6

6 #1

Attachment Form Motion for PHV

6 #2

Attachment Proposed Order

#7

#8

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CIVIL STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 1/28/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 502 before the Honorable Jodi W. Dishman. Status Report due by 1/20/2021. (nv) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, provided each counsel, as instructed by LCvR83.2(g), submits an ECF registration form and, upon activation, electronically files an entry of appearance consistent with LCvR83.4. Counsel must follow the local rules of this Court, including but not limited to immediate disclosures to the Court of any suspension, disbarment, or resignation that triggers the application of LCvR83.6(a). Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 12/14/2020. (nv) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Stephanie L. Cobau Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3448302 by Sonic Corp. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Form Motion for PHV, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Harris, Erick) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Craig J. Mariam Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3448281 by Sonic Corp. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Form Motion for PHV, #2 Attachment Admissions List, #3 Attachment Proposed Order)(Harris, Erick) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Scott A Edelsberg on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Edelsberg, Scott) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Defendant Sonic Corp. Sonic Corp waiver sent on 10/27/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Shamis, Andrew) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3340149. (Shamis, Andrew) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to Sonic Corp. (em) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Sonic Corp filed by Danny Collins(individually), Danny Collins(on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(em) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sonic Corp is a litigant