This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/02/2022 at 08:05:29 (UTC).

Collins et al v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 02/01/2022 Collins filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronnie L. White. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00129

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronnie L. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dennis Collins

Suzanne Collins

David Butler

Lucia Bott

Defendant

Metropolitan Life Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert R. Duncan

Attorney at DUNCAN LAW GROUP LLC

161 N. Clark St., Suite 2550

Chicago, IL 60601

James Podolny

Attorney at DUNCAN LAW GROUP LLC

161 N. Clark St., Suite 2550

Chicago, IL 60601

Steven Mikuzis

Attorney at MAG MILE LAW LLC

535 N. Michigan Ave., Suite 200

Chicago, IL 60611

Defendant Attorneys

Drew William Marrocco

Attorney at DENTONS US LLP - DC

1900 K St., Nw, Suite 100

Washington, DC 20006

Michael J. Duvall

Attorney at DENTONS US LLP - Los Angeles

601 South Figueroa St., Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5704

Sandra D. Hauser

Attorney at DENTONS US LLP - New York

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020-1089

Stephen J. O'Brien

Attorney at DENTONS US LLP - St Louis

One Metropolitan Square, Suite 3000

St. Louis, MO 63102

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Parent companies: MetLife, Inc., Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: MetLife, Inc.,. (O'Brien, Stephen) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

#14

(#14) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Defendant's Consent Motion For Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint) by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Duvall, Michael) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

12 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

12 #12

Main Document

11 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

11 #11

Main Document

#10

(#10) ENTRY of Appearance by Michael J. Duvall for Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Duvall, Michael) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#9

(#9) ENTRY of Appearance by Stephen J. O'Brien for Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (O'Brien, Stephen) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) Amended NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Lucia Bott, David Butler, Dennis Collins, Suzanne Collins Process Server: RTI, LLC (Podolny, James) Modified on 3/2/2022 (BRP). (Entered: 03/01/2022)

1 #7

Summons

1 #6

Original Filing Form

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Parent companies: MetLife, Inc., Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: MetLife, Inc.,. (O'Brien, Stephen) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • Docket(#16) Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). (Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 3/31/2022.) (TMT) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Docket Text ORDER re: ECF No. #14 , Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company; ORDERED GRANTED. Defendant's Answer shall be filed by May 24, 2022. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on March 18, 2022. (SMH) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Defendant's Consent Motion For Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint) by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Duvall, Michael) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • Docket(#13) Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Sandra Denise Hauser's and Drew Williams Marrocco's Verified Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice (ECF Nos. 11, 12) are GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 3/17/22. (JEB) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Drew William Marrocco. (Verified Motion For Admission Pro Hac Vice) The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9188289) by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Marrocco, Drew) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Sandra Denise Hauser. (Verified Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice) The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9188185) by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Hauser, Sandra) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ENTRY of Appearance by Michael J. Duvall for Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Duvall, Michael) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ENTRY of Appearance by Stephen J. O'Brien for Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (O'Brien, Stephen) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Dennis Collins, Lucia Bott, David Butler, Suzanne Collins. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company served on 3/1/2022, answer due 3/22/2022. (Podolny, James) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Amended NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Lucia Bott, David Butler, Dennis Collins, Suzanne Collins Process Server: RTI, LLC (Podolny, James) Modified on 3/2/2022 (BRP). (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Steven Mikuzis for Plaintiffs Lucia Bott, David Butler, Dennis Collins, Suzanne Collins. (Mikuzis, Steven) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • Docket(#5) Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). (Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 2/13/2022.) (TMT) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by James Podolny for Plaintiffs Lucia Bott, David Butler, Dennis Collins, Suzanne Collins. (Podolny, James) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • Docket(#3) Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that for all future filings, counsel must label all exhibits with both an exhibit designation (e.g., Ex. A), and a brief description of the exhibit (e.g., Petition), as required by Section II.F. of the Courts CM/ECF Procedures Manual and the instructions in red text on the filing screens. Failure to comply in future may result in the Court striking nonconforming filings for attorney error. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 2/2/22. (JEB) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketCase Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Ronnie L. White. 1 Summons(es) issued and emailed to attorney Robert R. Duncan. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). (BAK) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Lucia Bott, David Butler, Dennis Collins, Suzanne Collins Process Server: ABC Process Service, Inc. (Duncan, Robert) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company with receipt number AMOEDC-9105872, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Dennis Collins, Lucia Bott, David Butler, Suzanne Collins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Original Filing Form, #7 Summons)(Duncan, Robert) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael J Duvall

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen J. O'Brien

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sandra Hauser Esq.