This case was last updated from PACER on 10/08/2021 at 14:26:04 (UTC).

Collins et al v. AMEC Foster Wheeler Limited et al

Case Summary

On September 24, 2021, Edward Collins, Norman Fornella, Donald Piser and Irwin Wecker (collectively, “Plaintiffs”), represented by Joseph Andrew Matteo of Barnes & Thornburg LLP, filed a contract lawsuit against Amec Foster Wheeler Limited (“AMEC”) and John Wood Group PLC (“Wood Group”) (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking damages along with reasonable litigation expenses and attorneys’ fees for the alleged breach of contract and tortious interference with contracts by the Defendants. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Southern District of New York with Judge Vernon S. Broderick presiding.

 

In the complaint, the Plaintiffs alleged that, “In 1990, AMEC entered a joint venture with M/D. The joint venture agreement was structured as a New York general partnership between M/D and AMEC Projects, Inc. (“API”), a newly formed Delaware corporation that was a wholly owned subsidiary of AMEC. The joint venture was known as Morse Diesel International (“MDI”).”

 

The Plaintiffs also alleged that, “The long-term care insurance benefits were legally approved by the MDIC Board of Directors after Mr. Piser consulted with AMEC, and AMEC agreed the long-term care insurance benefits were appropriate.”

 

Plaintiffs then alleged that “For two decades, Wood Group, AMEC, or the subsidiary successor to MDI made good on their obligation to provide the Insurance Benefits Plan to Plaintiffs and their respective spouses.”

 

The Plaintiffs further alleged that, “Upon information and belief, Wood Group used its complete control over its subsidiaries to prevent AMEC from living up to its bargain and making good on its obligation to pay Plaintiffs’ insurance benefits under the Insurance Benefits Plan.”

 

The Plaintiffs laid down two claims for relief. The first claim is for alleged breach of contract of the buyout agreement by the Defendants. The second claim is for alleged tortious interference with the contract by the Wood Group.

 

In its prayer for relief, the Plaintiffs requested the Court for damages in an amount to be determined at trial, but in no event less than $75,000 and/or alternatively, an order requiring specific performance on the guarantee by the Defendants for breach of contract. The Plaintiffs also requested the Court for damages in an amount to be determined at trial, but in no event less than $75,000, for the alleged Tortious Interference with Contract along with an award of reasonable litigation expenses, attorneys’ fees, costs and interest or any other relief that the Court deems just and proper.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-07993

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vernon S. Broderick

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EDWARD COLLINS

NORMAN FORNELLA

DONALD PISER

IRWIN WECKER

Defendants

AMEC FOSTER WHEELER LIMITED

JOHN WOOD GROUP PLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Andrew Matteo

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg LLP

445 Park Avenue, Suite 700

New York, NY 10022

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to John Wood Group PLC..(jgo) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMEC Foster Wheeler Limited..(jgo) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to John Wood Group PLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Edward Collins, Norman Fornella, Donald Piser, Irwin Wecker..(Matteo, Joseph) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AMEC Foster Wheeler Limited, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Edward Collins, Norman Fornella, Donald Piser, Irwin Wecker..(Matteo, Joseph) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Matteo, Joseph) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

1 #2

Exhibit B-EMPLOYMENT CONTRACT

1 #1

Exhibit A-BUYOUT AGREEMENT

1 #1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to John Wood Group PLC..(jgo) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMEC Foster Wheeler Limited..(jgo) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to John Wood Group PLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Edward Collins, Norman Fornella, Donald Piser, Irwin Wecker..(Matteo, Joseph) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AMEC Foster Wheeler Limited, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Edward Collins, Norman Fornella, Donald Piser, Irwin Wecker..(Matteo, Joseph) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Matteo, Joseph) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Joseph Andrew Matteo. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York;. (pc) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Joseph Andrew Matteo. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Joseph Andrew Matteo. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: AMEC FOSTER WHEELER LIMITED, JOHN WOOD GROUP PLC, IRWIN WECKER, EDWARD COLLINS, DONALD PISER, NORMAN FORNELLA. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (pc) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against AMEC FOSTER WHEELER LIMITED, JOHN WOOD GROUP PLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25110146)Document filed by IRWIN WECKER, EDWARD COLLINS, DONALD PISER, NORMAN FORNELLA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-BUYOUT AGREEMENT, #2 Exhibit B-EMPLOYMENT CONTRACT).(Matteo, Joseph) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Andrew Matteo