This case was last updated from PACER on 09/20/2020 at 07:09:35 (UTC).

Collier v. The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/22/2020 Collier filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Martha M. Pacold. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-04298

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Martha M. Pacold

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Katina Collier

Defendant

The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christina M. Phillips

Attorney at Merlin Law Group

181 Madison St, Suite 3475

Chicago, IL 60602

Edward Eshoo, Jr.

Attorney at The Merlin Law Group

181 Madison St, Suite 3475

Chicago, IL 60602

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Docket entry #8 is vacated as entered in error on the incorrect docket. Mailed notice(maf) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#8

(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss 15 on or before 10/9/20. Defendant shall reply on or before 10/16/20. The Court will rule by mail. Status report deadline of 10/23/20 is vacated.Mailed notice(maf) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

7 #1

Initial Status Report outline

#7

(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 10/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Initial Status Report outline) (rao, ) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Katina Collier. The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company waiver sent on 8/11/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Eshoo, Edward) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Katina Collier by Christina M. Phillips (Phillips, Christina) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Katina Collier by Edward Eshoo, Jr (Eshoo, Edward) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Eshoo, Edward) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Katina Collier; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17241378. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Eshoo, Edward) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Docket entry #8 is vacated as entered in error on the incorrect docket. Mailed notice(maf) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss 15 on or before 10/9/20. Defendant shall reply on or before 10/16/20. The Court will rule by mail. Status report deadline of 10/23/20 is vacated.Mailed notice(maf) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 10/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Initial Status Report outline) (rao, ) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Katina Collier. The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company waiver sent on 8/11/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Eshoo, Edward) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company (exr, ) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, ) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Katina Collier by Christina M. Phillips (Phillips, Christina) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Katina Collier by Edward Eshoo, Jr (Eshoo, Edward) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Eshoo, Edward) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Katina Collier; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17241378. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Eshoo, Edward) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less