This case was last updated from PACER on 08/15/2020 at 12:12:28 (UTC).

Colister v. Georgia Department of Juvenile Justice

Case Summary

On 06/16/2020 Colister filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Georgia Department of Juvenile Justice. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amy Totenberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02541

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amy Totenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Colister, Jr.

Defendant

Georgia Department of Juvenile Justice

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rachel Becker Canfield

Attorney at The Kirby G. Smith Law Firm, LLC

Suite 105, 4488 N. Shallowford Rd.

Atlanta, GA 30338

Kirby Smith

Attorney at The Kirby G. Smith Law Firm, LLC

Suite 105, 4488 N. Shallowford Rd.

Atlanta, GA 30338

Defendant Attorney

Laura Wilkerson McDonald

Attorney at Office of State Attorney General-ATL

40 Capitol Square, S.W.

Atlanta, GA 30334-1300

 

Court Documents

14 #1

Text of Proposed Order on Defendant's Motion To Stay Proceedings

#14

(#14) MOTION to Stay by Georgia Department of Juvenile Justice. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order on Defendant's Motion To Stay Proceedings)(McDonald, Laura) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

#13

(#13) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint In Lieu of Answer with Brief In Support by Georgia Department of Juvenile Justice. (McDonald, Laura) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

#12

(#12) SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (dgs) (ADI) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

#11

(#11) FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (mmc) (ADI) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #6 Order, (McDonald, Laura) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

#9

(#9) FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #6 Order, (Canfield, Rachel) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE REGARDING FLSA CASES: In the event that a settlement is reached, the parties are DIRECTED to file a joint Motion for Approval of the Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 6/22/2020. (bnp) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

#6

(#6) STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto. To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II(J) of Appendix H to the Court's Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 6/22/2020. (bnp) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Colister, Jr. Georgia Department of Juvenile Justice waiver mailed on 6/17/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (Canfield, Rachel) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

#4

(#4) Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): July 13, July 14, July 15, July 16, July 17, by Rachel Becker Canfield. (Canfield, Rachel) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

#3

(#3) THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/26/20. (eop) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Georgia Department of Juvenile Justice. (eop) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by John Colister, Jr.. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9806651) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 06/17/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Stay by Georgia Department of Juvenile Justice. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order on Defendant's Motion To Stay Proceedings)(McDonald, Laura) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint In Lieu of Answer with Brief In Support by Georgia Department of Juvenile Justice. (McDonald, Laura) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (dgs) (ADI) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (mmc) (ADI) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #6 Order, (McDonald, Laura) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #6 Order, (Canfield, Rachel) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE REGARDING FLSA CASES: In the event that a settlement is reached, the parties are DIRECTED to file a joint Motion for Approval of the Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 6/22/2020. (bnp) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto. To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II(J) of Appendix H to the Court's Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 6/22/2020. (bnp) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Colister, Jr. Georgia Department of Juvenile Justice waiver mailed on 6/17/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (Canfield, Rachel) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): July 13, July 14, July 15, July 16, July 17, by Rachel Becker Canfield. (Canfield, Rachel) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/26/20. (eop) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Georgia Department of Juvenile Justice. (eop) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by John Colister, Jr.. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9806651) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less