This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 05:41:52 (UTC).

COLEMAN v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence case was filed by COLEMAN against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-17217

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Anne E. Thompson

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TRENELL J. COLEMAN

Respondent

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) CJA 20: Appointment of Attorney Michael A. Armstrong as CJA counsel for TRENELL J. COLEMAN. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 10/1/2019. (adi, ) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

#6

(#6) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to TRENELL J. COLEMAN. (jem) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #2 Petitioner's Motion to Appoint Counsel; Ordering the Clerk of Court to identify an attorney from the CJA list for appointment. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 9/17/2019. (M. Bilardo notified for appt of CJA counsel) (eaj) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#3

(#3) RESPONSE in Support filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (WIYGUL, ELISA) Modified on 9/17/2019 (jjc, ). (Entered: 09/13/2019)

2 #3

Envelope

2 #2

Letter

2 #1

Cover Letter

#2

(#2) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by TRENELL J. COLEMAN. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Letter, #3 Envelope)(jem) Modified on 9/17/2019 (jjc, ). (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#2

(#5) ORDER that the parties shall confer and submit a status report within 60 days of the entry of this Order; Ordering that a motion be filed if new counsel needs to be appointed within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 9/17/2019. (eaj) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

1 #1

Attachment

#1

(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) In Re to Criminal Case file 02-320 (AET), filed by TRENELL J. COLEMAN. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(abr) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CJA 20: Appointment of Attorney Michael A. Armstrong as CJA counsel for TRENELL J. COLEMAN. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 10/1/2019. (adi, ) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - TRENELL J. COLEMAN does not appear to have a correct mailing address listed with the court and may not be receiving his documents in this case. Pursuant to local rule 10.1, unrepresented parties must advise the Court of any change in their address within seven days of being apprised of such change by filing a notice of said change with the Clerk. Failure to file a notice of address change may result in the imposition of sanctions by the Court. (jem) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to TRENELL J. COLEMAN. (jem) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER that the parties shall confer and submit a status report within 60 days of the entry of this Order; Ordering that a motion be filed if new counsel needs to be appointed within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 9/17/2019. (eaj) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER granting #2 Petitioner's Motion to Appoint Counsel; Ordering the Clerk of Court to identify an attorney from the CJA list for appointment. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 9/17/2019. (M. Bilardo notified for appt of CJA counsel) (eaj) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RESPONSE in Support filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (WIYGUL, ELISA) Modified on 9/17/2019 (jjc, ). (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadlines as to #2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Motion set for 10/7/2019 before Judge Anne E. Thompson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem) Modified on 9/17/2019 (jjc, ). (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by TRENELL J. COLEMAN. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Letter, #3 Envelope)(jem) Modified on 9/17/2019 (jjc, ). (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) In Re to Criminal Case file 02-320 (AET), filed by TRENELL J. COLEMAN. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(abr) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.