This case was last updated from PACER on 12/26/2020 at 07:14:47 (UTC).

Coleman v. Transunion

Case Summary

On 10/27/2020 Coleman filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Transunion. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert M. Dow, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-06350

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert M. Dow, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Briesha Coleman

North Chicago, IL 60064

Defendant

Transunion

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel Owen Halvorsen

Attorney at TransUnion LLC

555 W. Adams Street

Chicago, IL 60661

William Madison Huse

Attorney at Schuckit & Associates, P.c.

4545 Northwestern Drive

Zionsville, IN 46077

Laura K. Rang

Attorney at Schuckit & Associates, P.C.

4545 Northwestern Drive

Zionsville, IN 46077

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing set for 12/4/2020 at 9:00 a.m. will be held telephonically. Participants should use the Court's toll-free, call-in number 877-336-1829, passcode is 6963747. Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

#9

(#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Transunion (Huse, William) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

#8

(#8) Trans Union, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint And Affirmative Defenses by Transunion(Huse, William) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

#7

(#7) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (aee, ) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#6

(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial telephone conference is set for 12/4/2020 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial; (3) The report should include a proposed case management schedule reflecting any disputes between the parties as to the proposed schedule. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the Courts action herein. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least THREE business days prior to the initial status and all further status hearings. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Transunion by Daniel Owen Halvorsen (Halvorsen, Daniel) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Transunion by Laura K. Rang (Rang, Laura) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Transunion (Huse, William) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Transunion by William Madison Huse (Huse, William) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit B - Complaint To Trans Union, LLC

1 #2

Exhibit A - Summons To Trans Union, LLC

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court Of Nineteenth Judicial Circuit, Lake County, case number (20SC00003149) filed by Transunion Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17581326. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons To Trans Union, LLC, #3 Exhibit B - Complaint To Trans Union, LLC)(Huse, William) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing set for 12/4/2020 at 9:00 a.m. will be held telephonically. Participants should use the Court's toll-free, call-in number 877-336-1829, passcode is 6963747. Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Transunion (Huse, William) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Trans Union, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint And Affirmative Defenses by Transunion(Huse, William) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (aee, ) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial telephone conference is set for 12/4/2020 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial; (3) The report should include a proposed case management schedule reflecting any disputes between the parties as to the proposed schedule. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the Courts action herein. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least THREE business days prior to the initial status and all further status hearings. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cm, ) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Transunion by Daniel Owen Halvorsen (Halvorsen, Daniel) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Transunion by Laura K. Rang (Rang, Laura) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Transunion (Huse, William) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Transunion by William Madison Huse (Huse, William) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court Of Nineteenth Judicial Circuit, Lake County, case number (20SC00003149) filed by Transunion Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17581326. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons To Trans Union, LLC, #3 Exhibit B - Complaint To Trans Union, LLC)(Huse, William) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less