This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/08/2022 at 07:09:31 (UTC).

COLEMAN v. LA GOURMANDINE, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/07/2022 COLEMAN filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against LA GOURMANDINE, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is David S. Cercone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00043

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David S. Cercone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAULA MICHELLE COLEMAN

Defendant

LA GOURMANDINE, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Samuel J. Cordes

Attorney at Rothman Gordon, P.C.

310 Grant Street, 3Rd Floor, Grant Building

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Defendant Attorney

April M. Hincy

Attorney at Bowles Rice LLP

1800 Main Street, Suite 200

Canonsbnurg, PA 15317

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against LA GOURMANDINE, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6889783), filed by PAULA MICHELLE COLEMAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jv) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to LA GOURMANDINE, LLC (jv) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (kak) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PAULA MICHELLE COLEMAN. LA GOURMANDINE, LLC waiver sent on 1/10/2022, answer due 3/11/2022. (Cordes, Samuel) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by LA GOURMANDINE, LLC. (Hincy, April) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by April M. Hincy on behalf of LA GOURMANDINE, LLC. (Hincy, April) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#7

(#7) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by LA GOURMANDINE, LLC. (Hincy, April) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by LA GOURMANDINE, LLC. (Hincy, April) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by April M. Hincy on behalf of LA GOURMANDINE, LLC. (Hincy, April) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by LA GOURMANDINE, LLC. (Hincy, April) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PAULA MICHELLE COLEMAN. LA GOURMANDINE, LLC waiver sent on 1/10/2022, answer due 3/11/2022. (Cordes, Samuel) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (kak) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to LA GOURMANDINE, LLC (jv) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against LA GOURMANDINE, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6889783), filed by PAULA MICHELLE COLEMAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jv) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less