Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/15/2021 at 07:38:05 (UTC).

COLEMAN v. GEICO CHOICE INSURANCE COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 03/16/2021 COLEMAN filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against GEICO CHOICE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JOSHUA D. WOLSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01266

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOSHUA D. WOLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASHLEY DOMINIQUE COLEMAN

Defendants

CREDIT COLLECTION SERVICES, INC.

GEICO CHOICE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREGORY J. GORSKI

Attorney at GORSKI LAW, PLLC

1635 Market Street, Suite 1600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorneys

SCOTT J. TREDWELL

Attorney at MCCORMICK & PRIORE, P.C.

Four Penn Center, Suite 800, 1600 John F. Kennedy Boulevard

Philadelphia, PA 19103

GLEN SHIKUNOV

Attorney at MCCORMICK PRIORE, P.C.

1600 Jfk Blvd, Suite 800

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS CREDIT COLLECTION SERVICES, INC. AND GEICO CHOICE INSURANCE COMPANY SHALL HAVE AN EXTENSION OF TIME OF 30 DAYS FROM THE DATE THIS STIPULATION IS APPROVED IN WHICH TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD TO PLAINTIF'S COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 05/10/2021. 05/10/2021 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja, ) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by GLEN SHIKUNOV on behalf of CREDIT COLLECTION SERVICES, INC. (SHIKUNOV, GLEN) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT J. TREDWELL on behalf of CREDIT COLLECTION SERVICES, INC. (TREDWELL, SCOTT) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ASHLEY DOMINIQUE COLEMAN. GEICO CHOICE INSURANCE COMPANY waiver sent on 4/8/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. (GORSKI, GREGORY) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by GLEN SHIKUNOV on behalf of GEICO CHOICE INSURANCE COMPANY (SHIKUNOV, GLEN) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT J. TREDWELL on behalf of GEICO CHOICE INSURANCE COMPANY (TREDWELL, SCOTT) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

#2

(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ASHLEY DOMINIQUE COLEMAN. CREDIT COLLECTION SERVICES, INC. waiver sent on 3/17/2021, answer due 5/17/2021. (GORSKI, GREGORY) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

1 #3

Case Management Track Form

1 #2

Designation Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against CREDIT COLLECTION SERVICES, INC., GEICO CHOICE INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14988330.), filed by ASHLEY DOMINIQUE COLEMAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(GORSKI, GREGORY) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS CREDIT COLLECTION SERVICES, INC. AND GEICO CHOICE INSURANCE COMPANY SHALL HAVE AN EXTENSION OF TIME OF 30 DAYS FROM THE DATE THIS STIPULATION IS APPROVED IN WHICH TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD TO PLAINTIF'S COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 05/10/2021. 05/10/2021 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja, ) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by GLEN SHIKUNOV on behalf of CREDIT COLLECTION SERVICES, INC. (SHIKUNOV, GLEN) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT J. TREDWELL on behalf of CREDIT COLLECTION SERVICES, INC. (TREDWELL, SCOTT) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ASHLEY DOMINIQUE COLEMAN. GEICO CHOICE INSURANCE COMPANY waiver sent on 4/8/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. (GORSKI, GREGORY) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by GLEN SHIKUNOV on behalf of GEICO CHOICE INSURANCE COMPANY (SHIKUNOV, GLEN) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT J. TREDWELL on behalf of GEICO CHOICE INSURANCE COMPANY (TREDWELL, SCOTT) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ASHLEY DOMINIQUE COLEMAN. CREDIT COLLECTION SERVICES, INC. waiver sent on 3/17/2021, answer due 5/17/2021. (GORSKI, GREGORY) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to CREDIT COLLECTION SERVICES, INC., GEICO CHOICE INSURANCE COMPANY. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 3/17/21 (bw, ) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by ASHLEY DOMINIQUE COLEMAN. (fb) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CREDIT COLLECTION SERVICES, INC., GEICO CHOICE INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14988330.), filed by ASHLEY DOMINIQUE COLEMAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(GORSKI, GREGORY) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CREDIT COLLECTION SERVICES COMMERCIAL is a litigant

Latest cases where Geico Choice Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREGORY J. GORSKI