This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/22/2021 at 10:50:27 (UTC).

Coleman v. Fiesta Mart, L.L.C.

Case Summary

On 11/23/2020 Coleman filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Fiesta Mart, L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee Yeakel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01161

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee Yeakel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patricia Jenee Coleman

Defendant

Fiesta Mart, L.L.C. doing business as Fiesta Mart #64

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Macmunn Burke

Thomas J. Henry

Defendant Attorneys

Trek C. Doyle

James Daniel Snyder

Karl W. Seelbach

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #10

Civil Cover Sheet [Supplemental]

#2

#3

#4

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/13/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ORDER SETTING Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference for 2/18/2021 at 02:30 PM before Judge Lee Yeakel. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jv2) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Proposed Scheduling Order [Agreed] by Fiesta Mart, L.L.C.. (Seelbach, Karl) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cj) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2020

DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Patricia Jenee Coleman. (cj) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2020

DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower (cj) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2020

DocketCase assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Fiesta Mart, L.L.C. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-14211449), filed by Fiesta Mart, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Civil Cover Sheet [Supplemental])(Seelbach, Karl) (Attachment 9 replaced and flattened on 11/23/2020) (cj). (Entered: 11/23/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less