This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/14/2019 at 07:42:24 (UTC).

COLEMAN v. DEVER et al

Case Summary

On 02/13/2019 COLEMAN filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against DEVER. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are N. C. TILLEY, JR and JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00173

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

N. C. TILLEY, JR

Referral Judge

JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RICHARD COLEMAN

Chapel Hill, NC 27514

Defendants

FEDERAL JUDGE SWANK

JUDGE MCGUIRE

JUDGE BUSHFAN

JUDGE EAGLES

JUDGE GREEN

KAY SILVER

JUDGE STEPHENS

FEDERAL JUDGE DEVER

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#2

2 #1

Envelope - Front and Back

#3

#4

#6

#7

7 #1

Envelope - Front and Back

#8

8 #1

Envelope - Front and Back

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE REFERRED regarding #4 RECOMMENDED RULING - MAGISTRATE JUDGE to JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR. (Winchester, Robin) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE REFERRED RE: #4 RECOMMENDED RULING - MAGISTRATE JUDGE, to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Winchester, Robin) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) OBJECTION by Plaintiff RICHARD COLEMAN to #4 ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back) (Daniel, J) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by RICHARD COLEMAN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back) (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice of Mailing Recommendation. Objections to R&R due by 3/21/2019. Objections to R&R for Pro Se due by 3/25/2019. (Coyne, Michelle) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 03/07/2019. See doc #4 Order and Recommendation. (Coyne, Michelle) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE Joi Elizabeth Peake, signed on 03/07/2019, that in forma paupris status be granted for the sole purpose of entering this Order and Recommendation. It is RECOMMENDED that this action be dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) for being frivolous, for failing to state a claim upon which relief may be granted, and for seeking monetary relief against a defendant who is immune from such relief as to Judges Dever, Swank, Bushfan, Green, Eagles, Stephens, and McGuire; and for failing to state a federal claim upon which relief may be granted and lack of federal subject matter jurisdiction as to any remaining claims including as to any claims against Defendant Silver. (Coyne, Michelle) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion Referred to Magistrate Judge Joi Elizabeth Peake RE: #1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP. (Coyne, Michelle) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Case Reassigned to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER no longer assigned to the case due to error in assignment. (Powell, Gloria) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion Referred to Magistrate Judge Joe L. Webster RE: #1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP. (Coyne, Michelle) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Coyne, Michelle) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Garland, Leah) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by RICHARD COLEMAN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back) (Garland, Leah) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) APPLICATION to Proceed IFP by RICHARD COLEMAN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Garland, Leah) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less