This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 05:22:58 (UTC).

Coleman v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 03/20/2019 Coleman filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillip J. Green. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00212

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Phillip J. Green

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Steven Coleman

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jacob Thomas Tighe

Attorney at Russell Law Firm, P.C.

2040 Raybrook Ave., Se, Ste. 204

Grand Rapids, MI 49546

Defendant Attorneys

Michael L. Shiparski

Attorney at U.S. Attorney (Grand Rapids)

The Law Bldg., 330 Ionia Ave., Nw, P.O. Box 208

Grand Rapids, MI 49501-0208

Pamela Ann Kultgen

Attorney at Social Security Administration (Kansas City)

Richard Bolling Federal Building, 601 E. 12Th St., Rm. 965

Kansas City, MO 64106

 

Court Documents

#15

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#14

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#13

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#12

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#11

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#9

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#8

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#7

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#6

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#5

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#4

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#2

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#1

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) REPLY BRIEF by plaintiff Steven Coleman (Tighe, Jacob) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) BRIEF by defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Kultgen, Pamela) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) INITIAL BRIEF by plaintiff Steven Coleman (Tighe, Jacob) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) JOINT STATEMENT consenting to proceed before the Magistrate Judge (Shiparski, Michael) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE to the parties regarding consent and filing of briefs according to the following schedule: joint statement regarding consent due 6/4/2019, plaintiff's initial brief due 6/18/2019; defendant's brief due 7/16/2019; plaintiff's reply brief due 7/30/2019 (jkw) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEEDINGS TRANSCRIPT In lieu of separate Answer - W.D. Mich. LCivR 8.3 by defendant Commissioner of Social Security [Attorney Michael L. Shiparski added to party Commissioner of Social Security(pty:dft)] (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Administrative Process Documents, #3 Payment Documents and Decisions - Exhibits 1A-4A, #4 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices - Exhibits 1B-15B, #5 Non Disability Related Development - Exhibits 1D-9D, #6 Disability Related Development - Exhibits 1E-11E, #7 Medical Records - Exhibits 1F-4F, #8 Medical Records - Exhibits 5F, #9 Medical Records - Exhibits 5F, #10 Medical Records - Exhibits 6F-11F, #11 Medical Records - Exhibits 12F-20F, #12 Medical Records - Exhibits 21F-27F, #13 Attachment Supplemental Transcript of Oral Hearing, dated 11/02/2017) (Shiparski, Michael) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Steven Coleman re Summons Issued as to USA #6 (Tighe, Jacob) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Pamela Ann Kultgen on behalf of defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Kultgen, Pamela) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Steven Coleman re Summons Issued as to USA #6 (Tighe, Jacob) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Steven Coleman re complaint #1 , Summons Issued as to USA #6 (Tighe, Jacob) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (clw) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) (DISREGARD) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Commissioner of Social Security (clw) Modified text on 3/21/2019 (clw). (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (clw) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Tighe, Jacob) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Steven Coleman in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4391752 (Tighe, Jacob) Modified text on 3/20/2019 (jlg) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Tighe, Jacob) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Steven Coleman (Tighe, Jacob) Modified text on 3/20/2019 (jlg) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less