This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/14/2022 at 07:44:43 (UTC).

Coleman v. Carter

Case Summary

On 11/15/2021 Coleman filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Carter. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles A. Pannell, Jr and Alan J. Baverman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-04720

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles A. Pannell, Jr

Referral Judge

Alan J. Baverman

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Torrey Coleman

Lithonia, GA 30558

Respondent

Katrina Carter

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Clint Christopher Malcolm

Attorney at Department of Law - 03

40 Capitol Square, S.W.

Atlanta, GA 30334

Paula K. Smith

Attorney at Department of Law - 03

40 Capitol Square, Sw

Atlanta, GA 30334

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Torrey Coleman. ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number GAN100134304.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(abm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 11/17/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) ORDER directing Clerk to perfect service of petition and order on respondent by certified mail, with copy to State Attorney General. Respondent is directed to show cause within 60 days of receipt of order why writ should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 12/1/2021. (vs) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Paula K. Smith on behalf of Katrina Carter (Smith, Paula) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Clint Christopher Malcolm on behalf of Katrina Carter (Malcolm, Clint) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Frank's Hearing by Torrey Coleman. (tcc) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Change of Address for Torrey Coleman. (tcc) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Change of Address for Torrey Coleman. (tcc) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Frank's Hearing by Torrey Coleman. (tcc) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Clint Christopher Malcolm on behalf of Katrina Carter (Malcolm, Clint) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Paula K. Smith on behalf of Katrina Carter (Smith, Paula) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Katrina Carter, Attorney General re #2 Order Directing Clerk to Perfect Service of HC Petition, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Certified mail receipt numbers: Chris Carr 91 7199 9991 7032 5718 5550; Katrina Carter 91 7199 9991 7032 5718 5543 (vs) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Torrey Coleman re #2 Order Directing Clerk to Perfect Service of HC Petition. (vs) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER directing Clerk to perfect service of petition and order on respondent by certified mail, with copy to State Attorney General. Respondent is directed to show cause within 60 days of receipt of order why writ should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 12/1/2021. (vs) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (abm) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Torrey Coleman. ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number GAN100134304.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(abm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CLINT C MALCOLM

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paula K. Smith