Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/26/2021 at 09:46:56 (UTC).

Cole v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company

Case Summary

On 01/25/2021 Cole filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Norfolk Southern Railway Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Pamela A. Barker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00197

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pamela A. Barker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jason Edward Cole

Defendant

Norfolk Southern Railway Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James J.B. Hux

Attorney at Ste. 18147

3 Severance Circle

Cleveland Heights, OH 44118

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Motion by James J. Hux to withdraw as attorney filed by Plaintiff Jason Edward Cole. (Hux, James) (Entered: 02/06/2021)

#3

(#3) Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons not provided, and were not issued. (L,MI) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketRequest to Clerk for refund of erroneous or duplicate on-line filing fee payment. Reason for refund request: Complaint was not attached and had to file a second time to file complaint, clerical error. Receipt #: AOHNDC-10593596, filed by Jason Edward Cole. (Hux, James) (Entered: 02/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder [non-document] Attorney Hux's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel (doc. no. #4 ) is granted. Within 30 days of the date of this order, any new counsel retained by Plaintiff Jason Edward Cole must file a Notice of Appearance on the docket. Attorney Hux is directed to provide a copy of this Order to Plaintiff Cole within 5 days. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 2/8/2021.(L,Ja) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Motion by James J. Hux to withdraw as attorney filed by Plaintiff Jason Edward Cole. (Hux, James) (Entered: 02/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons not provided, and were not issued. (L,MI) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (L,MI) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketJudge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case. (L,MI) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Complaint for damages and injunctive relief with jury demand against Norfolk Southern Railway Company. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-10595183. Filed by Jason Edward Cole. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Right to Sue) (Hux, James) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-10593596.. Filed by Jason Edward Cole. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Notice of Right to Sue) (Hux, James) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James J.B. Hux