This case was last updated from PACER on 12/27/2019 at 08:25:30 (UTC).

Cole v. C R Bard Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 10/28/2019 Cole filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sheryl H. Lipman and Diane K. Vescovo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02729

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sheryl H. Lipman

Referral Judge

Diane K. Vescovo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Timmy Ale Cole, Jr.

Defendants

C R Bard Incorporated

Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott R Seideman

Attorney at Seideman Law Firm PC

701 Commerce St., Ste. 400

Dallas, TX 75202

Defendant Attorneys

Shane Gibson Ramsey

Attorney at NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH LLP

150 Fourth Avenue North, Suite 1100

Nashville, TN 37219

Richard B North, Jr

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLC - Atlanta, GA

201 17Th St. Nw, Ste. 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

Eric Alfred Paine

Attorney at NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH, LLP

1320 Main Street, 17Th Floor

Columbia, SC 29201

Dell P Chappell

Attorney at NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH

1320 Main St., 17Th Floor

Columbia, SC 29201

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 12/19/19. (Lipman, Sheryl) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#18

(#18) STIPULATION of Dismissal by All Parties by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Ramsey, Shane) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#17

(#17) SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 12/11/19. (Lipman, Sheryl) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#16

(#16) NOTICE SETTING TRIAL WITH PRETRIAL PROCEDURES: Jury Trial set for Monday, April 19, 2021 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Trial expected to last 15-18 days. Proposed Pretrial Order due by Friday, April 2, 2021. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, April 9, 2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

14 #8

Exhibit H_CMO 14-Deposition Protocols

14 #6

Exhibit F_CMO 21-Discovery Protocol

14 #5

Exhibit E_CMO 12-Records Collection

14 #4

Exhibit D_CMO 17-AMENDED_PO and Expedited ESI Production - protective order

#14

(#14) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Joint). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Cole v. Bard, et al. - Joint Proposed Scheduling Order, #2 Exhibit B_Stipulated Protective Order, #3 Exhibit C_CMO 7-Adverse Event Redactions, #4 Exhibit D_CMO 17-AMENDED_PO and Expedited ESI Production - protective order, #5 Exhibit E_CMO 12-Records Collection, #6 Exhibit F_CMO 21-Discovery Protocol, #7 Exhibit G_CMO 9 -ESI Production Protocol, #8 Exhibit H_CMO 14-Deposition Protocols)(Chappell, Dell) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER GRANTING #6 MOTION FOR RICHARD B. NORTH, JR. TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo on 10/29/2019. (Vescovo, Diane) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

#6

(#7) ORDER GRANTING #6 MOTION FOR RICHARD B. NORTH, JR. TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo on 10/29/2019. (Vescovo, Diane) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Shane Gibson Ramsey on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Ramsey, Shane) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

4 #2

Exhibit judges' cards and docket sheet

4 #1

*Restricted*

#4

(#4) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-03824. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/28/2019: #2 Exhibit judges' cards and docket sheet) (agj). (Entered: 10/28/2019)

#3

(#3) SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (SECOND). (See document for details). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/17/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/28/2019.] (Entered: 10/21/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16974963 filed by Timmy Ale Cole, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/28/2019.] (Entered: 05/30/2019)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 12/19/19. (Lipman, Sheryl) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) STIPULATION of Dismissal by All Parties by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Ramsey, Shane) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 12/11/19. (Lipman, Sheryl) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE SETTING TRIAL WITH PRETRIAL PROCEDURES: Jury Trial set for Monday, April 19, 2021 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Trial expected to last 15-18 days. Proposed Pretrial Order due by Friday, April 2, 2021. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, April 9, 2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • (#15) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman: Scheduling Conference was held on 12/11/2019. On the phone was Scott R. Seideman for the plaintiff. Present in court was Dell P. Chapell for the defendant. The court discussed dates and deadlines with the parties. Jury Trial set for Monday, April 19, 2021 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Trial expected to last 15-18 days. Proposed Pretrial Order due by Friday, April 2, 2021. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, April 9, 2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Scheduling Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Candace Covey) (smm) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Joint). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Cole v. Bard, et al. - Joint Proposed Scheduling Order, #2 Exhibit B_Stipulated Protective Order, #3 Exhibit C_CMO 7-Adverse Event Redactions, #4 Exhibit D_CMO 17-AMENDED_PO and Expedited ESI Production - protective order, #5 Exhibit E_CMO 12-Records Collection, #6 Exhibit F_CMO 21-Discovery Protocol, #7 Exhibit G_CMO 9 -ESI Production Protocol, #8 Exhibit H_CMO 14-Deposition Protocols)(Chappell, Dell) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO IMAGE ATTACHED.**] Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 11/14/19. (Lipman, Sheryl) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO IMAGE ATTACHED.**] Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 11/14/19. (Lipman, Sheryl) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Eric A. Paine (proposed order submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3214634) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Paine, Eric) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Dell P. Chappell (proposed order submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3214619) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Chappell, Dell) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Wednesday, December 11, 2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Ramsey, Shane) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER GRANTING #6 MOTION FOR RICHARD B. NORTH, JR. TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo on 10/29/2019. (Vescovo, Diane) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Richard B. North, Jr. (proposed order submitted) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Ramsey, Shane) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Shane Gibson Ramsey on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Ramsey, Shane) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-03824. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/28/2019: #2 Exhibit judges' cards and docket sheet) (agj). (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • Remark: Case transferred to the Western District of Tennessee via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/28/2019.] (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (SECOND). (See document for details). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/17/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/28/2019.] (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • (#2) This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-3824-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/28/2019.] (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16974963 filed by Timmy Ale Cole, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/28/2019.] (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less