This case was last updated from PACER on 12/24/2019 at 08:04:27 (UTC).

Cole v. C R Bard Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 10/25/2019 Cole filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Roy Percy and Glen H. Davidson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00238

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Roy Percy

Presiding Judge

Glen H. Davidson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marcus Dean Cole

Defendants

C R Bard Incorporated

Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John A Dalimonte

Attorney at Dalimonte Rueb Stoller LLP

85 Devonshire St., Ste. 1000

Boston, MA 02109

Paul Lincoln Stoller

Attorney at Dalimonte Rueb Stoller LLP - Phoenix, AZ

2425 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 500

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Sheila M. Bossier

Attorney at BOSSIER & ASSOCIATES, PLLC

P.O. Box 55567

Jackson, MS 39296

Paul L. Stoller

Attorney at DALIMONTE RUEB STOLLER, LLP

2425 E. Camelback Road, Suite 500

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Ashley C. Crowell

Attorney at DALIMONTE RUEB STOLLER, LLP

2425 E. Camelback Road, Suite 500

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Defendant Attorneys

Richard B. North, Jr.

Attorney at NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH, LLP

201 17Th Street Nw, Suite 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

J. Carter Thompson, Jr.

Attorney at BAKER, DONELSON, BEARMAN & CALDWELL - Jackson

One Eastover Center, 100 Vision Dr., Ste. 400, Post Office Box 14167

Jackson, MS 39236-4167

Elizabeth Ross Hadley

Attorney at GREENBERG TRAURIG

300 West 6Th Street, Suite 2050

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) ORDER granting #18 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 12/12/19. (cs)

#18

(#18) MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL by Marcus Dean Cole. (Crowell, Ashley) Modified on 12/11/2019 (tab).

#17

(#17) INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 1/10/2020 11:30 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 12/10/19. (rtc)

#16

(#16) ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Ashley C. Crowell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/27/19. (cs)

14 #1

Exhibit "A"

#14

(#14) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Paul L. Stoller,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1743933) by Marcus Dean Cole. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Bossier, Sheila)

13 #2

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

13 #1

Exhibit "A"

#13

(#13) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Ashley Carrington Crowell,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1743931) by Marcus Dean Cole. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Bossier, Sheila)

5 #9

Master and Short-Form Pleadings

5 #2

Case Management Orders

5 #1

Bard Docket Sheet (Main MDL Case)

#5

(#5) MDL TRANSFER ORDER (Attachments: #1 Bard Docket Sheet (Main MDL Case), #2 Case Management Orders, #3 Discovery Orders, #4 Discovery and Privilege Orders, #5 Daubert Orders, #6 Motions in Limine Orders, #7 Deposition Designation Orders, #8 Miscellaneous Orders, #9 Master and Short-Form Pleadings) (jtm)

4 #1

*Restricted*

#4

(#4) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-02182. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.

#3

(#3) SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. (Second) See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/17/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.] (Entered: 10/21/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16737615 filed by Marcus Dean Cole. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.]

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER granting #18 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 12/12/19. (cs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL by Marcus Dean Cole. (Crowell, Ashley) Modified on 12/11/2019 (tab).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 1/10/2020 11:30 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 12/10/19. (rtc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Ashley C. Crowell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/27/19. (cs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Paul L. Stoller. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/27/19. (cs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Paul L. Stoller,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1743933) by Marcus Dean Cole. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Bossier, Sheila)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Ashley Carrington Crowell,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1743931) by Marcus Dean Cole. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Bossier, Sheila)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CORPORATE STATEMENT OF DEFENDANTS. (Hadley, Elizabeth)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting #10 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Richard B. North, Jr terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/12/19. (cs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Richard North, Jr., MOTION to Substitute Attorney Elizabeth Ross Hadley by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Hadley, Elizabeth)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sheila M. Bossier on behalf of Marcus Dean Cole (Bossier, Sheila)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth Ross Hadley on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Hadley, Elizabeth)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CLERK'S NOTICE of Failure by Counsel to be Admitted to Practice Re: Richard B. North, Jr, Paul Lincoln Stoller, John A Dalimonte (jtm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Glen H. Davidson and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (jtm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MDL TRANSFER ORDER (Attachments: #1 Bard Docket Sheet (Main MDL Case), #2 Case Management Orders, #3 Discovery Orders, #4 Discovery and Privilege Orders, #5 Daubert Orders, #6 Motions in Limine Orders, #7 Deposition Designation Orders, #8 Miscellaneous Orders, #9 Master and Short-Form Pleadings) (jtm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-02182. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • Remark: Transferring Case to the Northern District of Mississippi via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. (Second) See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/17/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.] (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • (#2) This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-2182-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16737615 filed by Marcus Dean Cole. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.