This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 14:18:59 (UTC).

COLBERT v REGIONS FINANCIAL CORPORATIONS

Case Summary

On 06/04/2019 COLBERT filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against REGIONS FINANCIAL CORPORATIONS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is W LOUIS SANDS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:19-CV-00079

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

W LOUIS SANDS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALFRED COLBERT

Defendants

REGIONS FINANCIAL CORPORATIONS

REGIONS BANK

REGIONS FINANCIAL CORPORATIONS doing business as REGIONS BANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NATHANIEL TYRONE HAUGABROOK

102 E Adair St

Valdosta, GA 31601

Defendant Attorneys

WILLIAM J HOLLEY, II

303 Peachtree Street, Ne, Suite 3600

Atlanta, GA 30308

JOHN H ELLIOTT

303 Peachtree St Ne Ste 3600

Atlanta, GA 30308

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Compel Arbitration. The Court stays this case pending arbitration. The parties are ordered to file a joint status report no later than 10/9/19. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 7/11/19. (sbd) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Amend/Correct the Complaint. Defendant's name will be corrected to Regions Bank. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 6/26/19. (sbd) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, by ALFRED COLBERT filed by NATHANIEL TYRONE HAUGABROOK.(HAUGABROOK, NATHANIEL) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALFRED COLBERT (HAUGABROOK, NATHANIEL) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALFRED COLBERT (HAUGABROOK, NATHANIEL) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#5

(#5) Jurisdictional Statement by REGIONS FINANCIAL CORPORATIONS (ELLIOTT, JOHN) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

4 #2

Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Kimberly Burkhalter Townsley

4 #1

Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant's Motion to

#4

(#4) MOTION to Compel Arbitration by REGIONS FINANCIAL CORPORATIONS filed by JOHN H ELLIOTT. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Kimberly Burkhalter Townsley)(ELLIOTT, JOHN) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by REGIONS FINANCIAL CORPORATIONS identifying Corporate Parent REGIONS FINANCIAL CORPORATION for REGIONS FINANCIAL CORPORATIONS. (ELLIOTT, JOHN) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#2

(#2) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to REGIONS FINANCIAL CORPORATIONS. (sbd) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Lower Court Pleadings

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Albert Colbert Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3177990, $400 filed by Regions Financial Corporations d/b/a Regions Bank (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Lower Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ELLIOTT, JOHN) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Compel Arbitration. The Court stays this case pending arbitration. The parties are ordered to file a joint status report no later than 10/9/19. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 7/11/19. (sbd) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Amend/Correct the Complaint. Defendant's name will be corrected to Regions Bank. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 6/26/19. (sbd) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, by ALFRED COLBERT filed by NATHANIEL TYRONE HAUGABROOK.(HAUGABROOK, NATHANIEL) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by ALFRED COLBERT ) - Document filed in the wrong case. Should be filed in 7:19-cv-80. (rlw) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALFRED COLBERT (HAUGABROOK, NATHANIEL) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALFRED COLBERT (HAUGABROOK, NATHANIEL) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Jurisdictional Statement by REGIONS FINANCIAL CORPORATIONS (ELLIOTT, JOHN) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Compel Arbitration by REGIONS FINANCIAL CORPORATIONS filed by JOHN H ELLIOTT. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Kimberly Burkhalter Townsley)(ELLIOTT, JOHN) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by REGIONS FINANCIAL CORPORATIONS identifying Corporate Parent REGIONS FINANCIAL CORPORATION for REGIONS FINANCIAL CORPORATIONS. (ELLIOTT, JOHN) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by REGIONS FINANCIAL CORPORATIONS ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately.Pursuant to Local Rule 87.2 a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed. (sbd) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by REGIONS FINANCIAL CORPORATIONS ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. NO NEED TO REFILE. (sbd) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to REGIONS FINANCIAL CORPORATIONS. (sbd) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Albert Colbert Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3177990, $400 filed by Regions Financial Corporations d/b/a Regions Bank (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Lower Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ELLIOTT, JOHN) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less