This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/19/2021 at 08:18:39 (UTC).

Cohen et al v. hughes et al

Case Summary

On 09/20/2021 Cohen filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against hughes. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy S. Black. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00601

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy S. Black

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Daniel Cohen

Smyrna, GA 30080

david cohen

Smyrna, GA 30080

Defendants

duane hughes

Steve schrader

Robert Willison

Raymond Chess

Gerald Budde

Harry Demott

Michael Clark

Jacqueline Dedo

Pamela Mader

Benjamin Samuels

Raymond J. Chess

Gerald B. Budde

Michael L. Clark

Jacqueline A. Dedo

Pamela S. Mader

H. Benjamin Samuels

Workhorse Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael I. Fistel, Jr.

Attorney at Johnson Fistel, LLP

40 Powder Springs St.

Marietta, GA 30064

Thomas J Connick

Attorney at Connick Law, LLC

25550 Chargrin Blvd, #101

Beachwood, OH 44122

Defendant Attorneys

Russell S Sayre

Attorney at Taft Stettinius & Hollister - 1

425 Walnut Street, Suite 1800

Cincinnati, OH 45202-3957

Aaron Mark Herzig

Attorney at Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP

425 Walnut Street, Suite 1800

Cincinnati, OH 45202

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER granting transfer to the Central District of California. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 11/5/2021. (rrs) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

#11

(#11) AGREED ORDER granting extension of time for Defendants to move or otherwise plead. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 11/4/2021. (rrs) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order

10 #10

Main Document

9 #1

Appendix Member of Good Standing

9 #9

Main Document

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Workhorse Group, Inc.. Workhorse Group, Inc. served on 9/23/2021, answer due 10/14/2021. (Connick, Thomas) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Mark Herzig for Defendants Gerald B. Budde, Raymond J. Chess, Michael L. Clark, Jacqueline A. Dedo, Harry Demott, Duane Hughes, Pamela S. Mader, H. Benjamin Samuels, Steve Schrader, Robert Willison, Workhorse Group, Inc. (Herzig, Aaron) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Russell S Sayre for Defendants Gerald B. Budde, Raymond J. Chess, Michael L. Clark, Jacqueline A. Dedo, Harry Demott, Duane Hughes, Pamela S. Mader, H. Benjamin Samuels, Steve Schrader, Robert Willison, Workhorse Group, Inc. (Sayre, Russell) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 9/22/2021. Case reassigned to Judge Timothy S. Black for all further proceedings. Judge Susan J. Dlott no longer assigned to case. (eh) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Gerald B. Budde, Raymond J. Chess, Michael L. Clark, Jacqueline A. Dedo, Harry Demott, Duane Hughes, Pamela S. Mader, H. Benjamin Samuels, Steve Schrader, Robert Willison, Workhorse Group, Inc. (eh) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

3 #9

Summons Form to Workhorse

3 #7

Summons Form to Schrader

3 #6

Summons Form to Samuels

3 #5

Summons Form to Mader

3 #4

Summons Form to Hughes

3 #3

Summons Form to Demott

3 #3

Main Document

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • Docket***Case transferred from Ohio Southern has been opened in CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA as case 2:21-cv-08734, filed 11/05/2021. (er) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketCase transferred to Central District of California.Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (rrs) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting transfer to the Central District of California. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 11/5/2021. (rrs) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AGREED ORDER granting extension of time for Defendants to move or otherwise plead. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 11/4/2021. (rrs) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION Stipulation re Transfer and Initial Pleading Matters by Defendants Gerald B. Budde, Raymond J. Chess, Michael L. Clark, Jacqueline A. Dedo, Harry Demott, Duane Hughes, Pamela S. Mader, H. Benjamin Samuels, Steve Schrader, Robert Willison, Workhorse Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Sayre, Russell) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTATION ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael I. Fistel, Jr. as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 9/30/2021. (eh) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8519584) of Michael I. Fistel, Jr. Esq. by Plaintiffs Daniel Cohen, David Cohen. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Member of Good Standing) (Connick, Thomas) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Workhorse Group, Inc.. Workhorse Group, Inc. served on 9/23/2021, answer due 10/14/2021. (Connick, Thomas) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Mark Herzig for Defendants Gerald B. Budde, Raymond J. Chess, Michael L. Clark, Jacqueline A. Dedo, Harry Demott, Duane Hughes, Pamela S. Mader, H. Benjamin Samuels, Steve Schrader, Robert Willison, Workhorse Group, Inc. (Herzig, Aaron) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Russell S Sayre for Defendants Gerald B. Budde, Raymond J. Chess, Michael L. Clark, Jacqueline A. Dedo, Harry Demott, Duane Hughes, Pamela S. Mader, H. Benjamin Samuels, Steve Schrader, Robert Willison, Workhorse Group, Inc. (Sayre, Russell) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 9/22/2021. Case reassigned to Judge Timothy S. Black for all further proceedings. Judge Susan J. Dlott no longer assigned to case. (eh) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Gerald B. Budde, Raymond J. Chess, Michael L. Clark, Jacqueline A. Dedo, Harry Demott, Duane Hughes, Pamela S. Mader, H. Benjamin Samuels, Steve Schrader, Robert Willison, Workhorse Group, Inc. (eh) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketIf this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (bjc) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form to Clark, #2 Summons Form to Dedo, #3 Summons Form to Demott, #4 Summons Form to Hughes, #5 Summons Form to Mader, #6 Summons Form to Samuels, #7 Summons Form to Schrader, #8 Summons Form to Willison, #9 Summons Form to Workhorse) (Connick, Thomas) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. to Def Budde (Connick, Thomas) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Gerald Budde, Raymond Chess, Michael Clark, Jacqueline Dedo, Harry Demott, Pamela Mader, Benjamin Samuels, Robert Willison, duane hughes, Steve schrader ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8505654), filed by david cohen, Daniel Cohen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Letter, #2 Exhibit Exhibit b - Letter, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Letter) (Connick, Thomas) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WORKHORSE GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Aaron M. Herzig

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Russell Stanfield Sayre