This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/28/2022 at 07:49:43 (UTC).

Cohan v. Samba Midtown LLC

Case Summary

On 09/29/2022 Cohan filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Samba Midtown LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is William P. Dimitrouleas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-23164

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William P. Dimitrouleas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Howard Cohan

Defendant

Samba Midtown LLC doing business as Sugarcane

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason Stuart Weiss

Defendant Attorneys

Alejandro Israel Leiva

Peter Ross Siegel

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summon(s)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Samba Midtown LLC. (rbe) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER REQUIRING CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL REGARDING ANY PRIOR FILINGS UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/4/2022. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/4/2022. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #4 Order by Jason Stuart Weiss on behalf of Howard Cohan (Weiss, Jason) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document. Samba Midtown LLC. Response/Answer due 11/11/2022. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/26/2022. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

#9

(#9) Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Samba Midtown LLC. Attorney Alejandro Israel Leiva added to party Samba Midtown LLC(pty:dft). (Leiva, Alejandro) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Samba Midtown LLC. Attorney Alejandro Israel Leiva added to party Samba Midtown LLC(pty:dft). (Leiva, Alejandro) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document. Samba Midtown LLC. Response/Answer due 11/11/2022. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/26/2022. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Samba Midtown LLC. Attorney Peter Ross Siegel added to party Samba Midtown LLC(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siegel, Peter) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #4 Order by Jason Stuart Weiss on behalf of Howard Cohan (Weiss, Jason) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/4/2022. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REQUIRING CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL REGARDING ANY PRIOR FILINGS UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/4/2022. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Samba Midtown LLC. (rbe) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (rbe) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Samba Midtown LLC. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15985215, filed by Howard Cohan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Weiss, Jason) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less