This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/19/2023 at 06:00:41 (UTC).

Cohan v. Red Lobster Hospitality LLC

Case Summary

On 11/18/2022 Cohan filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Red Lobster Hospitality LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Anne C. Conway and Leslie Hoffman Price. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-02155

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Anne C. Conway

Referral Judge

Leslie Hoffman Price

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Howard Cohan

Defendant

Red Lobster Hospitality LLC a Foreign Limited Liability Company doing business as Red Lobster

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory Steven Sconzo

Attorney at Sconzo Law Office, P.A.

3825 Pga Blvd, Suite 207

Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410

Defendant Attorney

Joyce Ackerbaum Cox

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Suite 2300, 200 S Orange Ave.

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) ORDER dismissing case without prejudice and subject to the right of the parties, within sixty (60) days of the date of this order, to submit a stipulated form of final order or judgment should they so choose or for any party to move to reopen the action, upon good cause shown. After that 60-day period, however, dismissal shall be with prejudice. Any pending motions are denied as moot and the Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 2/9/2023. (KM) (Entered: 02/10/2023)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of settlement by Howard Cohan (Sconzo, Gregory) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

#17

(#17) ORDER severing Plaintiff Howard Cohan's claims. Plaintiff's claim related to Defendant Red Lobster's location in Melbourne, Brevard County, shall remain in the instant case. On or before 2/21/2023, Plaintiff shall file an amended pleading in this case that asserts only his claim regarding Red Lobster's Melbourne location. On or before 2/21/2023, Plaintiff shall file a separate action asserting only his claim related to Red Lobster's location in Altamonte Springs, Seminole County, and pay a separate filing fee for the case. The new case filed pursuant to this order shall be assigned to District Judge Anne C. Conway and Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. At the time the new case is filed, Plaintiff's counsel shall provide the Clerk a copy of this order. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 1/31/2023. (KM) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

#16

(#16) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Red Lobster Hospitality LLC.(Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

#15

(#15) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #14 Interested Persons Order, by Red Lobster Hospitality LLC identifying Other Affiliate Red Lobster Master Holdings, L.P., Other Affiliate Thai Union Group PCL for Red Lobster Hospitality LLC. (Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

#14

(#14) INITIAL CASE ORDER (ADA waiving CMR requirement) as to Defendant - Notice of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Parties have 14 days from the date of this order to file their disclosure statement (if not already filed) and to notify the court of a related action (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 12/19/2022. (KM) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

#13

(#13) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. The deadline for Defendant to respond to the complaint is extended up to and including January 20, 2023. No other deadlines are extended by this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 12/14/2022. (MKH) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

#12

(#12) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Red Lobster Hospitality LLC. (Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. (Entered: 12/14/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Gregory Steven Sconzo on behalf of Howard Cohan. Lead Counsel: Gregory S. Sconzo. (Sconzo, Gregory) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

10 #2

Exhibit

10 #1

Exhibit

10 #10

Main Document

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Howard Cohan. (Sconzo, Gregory) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Howard Cohan. Related case(s): Yes (Sconzo, Gregory) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

#6

(#6) RETURN of service executed on 11/30/2022 by Howard Cohan as to Red Lobster Hospitality LLC. (Sconzo, Gregory) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER dismissing case without prejudice and subject to the right of the parties, within sixty (60) days of the date of this order, to submit a stipulated form of final order or judgment should they so choose or for any party to move to reopen the action, upon good cause shown. After that 60-day period, however, dismissal shall be with prejudice. Any pending motions are denied as moot and the Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 2/9/2023. (KM) (Entered: 02/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of settlement by Howard Cohan (Sconzo, Gregory) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER severing Plaintiff Howard Cohan's claims. Plaintiff's claim related to Defendant Red Lobster's location in Melbourne, Brevard County, shall remain in the instant case. On or before 2/21/2023, Plaintiff shall file an amended pleading in this case that asserts only his claim regarding Red Lobster's Melbourne location. On or before 2/21/2023, Plaintiff shall file a separate action asserting only his claim related to Red Lobster's location in Altamonte Springs, Seminole County, and pay a separate filing fee for the case. The new case filed pursuant to this order shall be assigned to District Judge Anne C. Conway and Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. At the time the new case is filed, Plaintiff's counsel shall provide the Clerk a copy of this order. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 1/31/2023. (KM) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Red Lobster Hospitality LLC.(Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #14 Interested Persons Order, by Red Lobster Hospitality LLC identifying Other Affiliate Red Lobster Master Holdings, L.P., Other Affiliate Thai Union Group PCL for Red Lobster Hospitality LLC. (Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) INITIAL CASE ORDER (ADA waiving CMR requirement) as to Defendant - Notice of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Parties have 14 days from the date of this order to file their disclosure statement (if not already filed) and to notify the court of a related action (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 12/19/2022. (KM) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. The deadline for Defendant to respond to the complaint is extended up to and including January 20, 2023. No other deadlines are extended by this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 12/14/2022. (MKH) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Red Lobster Hospitality LLC. (Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. (Entered: 12/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Gregory Steven Sconzo on behalf of Howard Cohan. Lead Counsel: Gregory S. Sconzo. (Sconzo, Gregory) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to court interrogatories by Howard Cohan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Sconzo, Gregory) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Howard Cohan. (Sconzo, Gregory) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Howard Cohan. Related case(s): Yes (Sconzo, Gregory) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE to counsel Gregory Steven Sconzo of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRD) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN of service executed on 11/30/2022 by Howard Cohan as to Red Lobster Hospitality LLC. (Sconzo, Gregory) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ADA SCHEDULING ORDER setting various deadlines. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 11/22/2022. (KM) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS issued as to Red Lobster Hospitality LLC. (SRD) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INITIAL CASE ORDER (ADA waiving CMR requirement) - Notice of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Parties have 14 days from the date of this order to file their disclosure statement (if not already filed) and to notify the court of a related action (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 11/18/2022. (KM) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Anne C. Conway and Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. New case number: 6:22-cv-02155-ACC-LHP. (APV) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Red Lobster Hospitality LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-20217603) filed by Howard Cohan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Sconzo, Gregory) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less