This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/04/2022 at 06:40:25 (UTC).

Cohan v. Red Lobster Hospitality LLC

Case Summary

On 02/11/2022 Cohan filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Red Lobster Hospitality LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Leslie Hoffman Price and Carlos E. Mendoza. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00318

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Leslie Hoffman Price

Presiding Judge

Carlos E. Mendoza

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Howard Cohan

Defendant

Red Lobster Hospitality, LLC a Foreign Limited Liability Company doing business as Red Lobster #6246

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory Steven Sconzo

Attorney at Sconzo Law Office, P.A.

3825 Pga Blvd, Suite 207

Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410

Defendant Attorneys

Joyce Ackerbaum Cox

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Suite 2300, 200 S Orange Ave.

Orlando, FL 32801

Nailah Donnaye Bowen

Attorney at Baker Hostetler

200 S. Orange Avenue, 2300

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Red Lobster Hospitality LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-19226521) filed by Howard Cohan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Sconzo, Gregory) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Red Lobster Hospitality, LLC. (BD) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#4

(#4) RETURN of service executed on 2/15/2022 by Howard Cohan as to Red Lobster Hospitality, LLC. (Sconzo, Gregory) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

#5

(#5) INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 2/23/2022. (MEH) ctp (Entered: 02/23/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Howard Cohan. Related case(s): No (Sconzo, Gregory) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Order by Howard Cohan. (Sconzo, Gregory) Modified on 3/8/2022 (SPM). (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#9

(#9) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Red Lobster Hospitality, LLC.(Bowen, Nailah) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Joyce Ackerbaum Cox on behalf of Red Lobster Hospitality, LLC (Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Red Lobster Hospitality, LLC. Related case(s): No (Bowen, Nailah) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Order by Red Lobster Hospitality, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Thai Union Group Public Company Limited for Red Lobster Hospitality, LLC. (Bowen, Nailah) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#13

(#13) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Sconzo, Gregory) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

#14

(#14) Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Howard Cohan. (Sconzo, Gregory) Modified on 5/13/2022 (SPM). (Entered: 05/13/2022)

#15

(#15) ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to close this case re #14 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 5/17/2022. (ALL) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to close this case re #14 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 5/17/2022. (ALL) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Howard Cohan. (Sconzo, Gregory) Modified on 5/13/2022 (SPM). (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Sconzo, Gregory) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Order by Red Lobster Hospitality, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Thai Union Group Public Company Limited for Red Lobster Hospitality, LLC. (Bowen, Nailah) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Red Lobster Hospitality, LLC. Related case(s): No (Bowen, Nailah) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Joyce Ackerbaum Cox on behalf of Red Lobster Hospitality, LLC (Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Red Lobster Hospitality, LLC.(Bowen, Nailah) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Order by Howard Cohan. (Sconzo, Gregory) Modified on 3/8/2022 (SPM). (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Howard Cohan. Related case(s): No (Sconzo, Gregory) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 2/23/2022. (MEH) ctp (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 2/23/2022. (MEH) ctp (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RETURN of service executed on 2/15/2022 by Howard Cohan as to Red Lobster Hospitality, LLC. (Sconzo, Gregory) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Red Lobster Hospitality, LLC. (BD) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. New case number: 6:22-cv-318-CEM-LHP. (MLJ) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Red Lobster Hospitality LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-19226521) filed by Howard Cohan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Sconzo, Gregory) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RED LOBSTER HOSPITALITY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nailah Donnaye Bowen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joyce Ackerbaum Cox