This case was last updated from PACER on 12/22/2020 at 08:34:37 (UTC).

Cohan v. PFL VII, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/23/2020 Cohan filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against PFL VII, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Roy K. Altman and Patrick M. Hunt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-62158

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Roy K. Altman

Referral Judge

Patrick M. Hunt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Howard Cohan

Defendant

PFL VII, LLC a Foreign Limited Liability Company doing business as The Westin Fort Lauderdale

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory Steven Sconzo

Attorney at Law Office of Gregory S. Sconzo, P.A.

5080 Pga Boulevard, Suite 213

Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418

Defendant Attorneys

Paul J DeBoe

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins

9130 S. Dadeland Blvd., Suite 1625

Miami, FL 33156

Eric A. Berg

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) NOTICE by Howard Cohan of Non-Settlement (Sconzo, Gregory) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

9 #2

Text of Proposed Order

9 #1

Certification

#9

(#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Eric Berg. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14014710 by PFL VII, LLC. Responses due by 12/28/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DeBoe, Paul) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCES: Status Conference set for 12/14/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Roy K. Altman. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 12/8/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by PFL VII, LLC. Attorney Paul J DeBoe added to party PFL VII, LLC(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeBoe, Paul) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES Joint Scheduling Report due by 12/22/2020 Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 12/1/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#4

(#4) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Howard Cohan. Responses due by 12/15/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sconzo, Gregory) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to PFL VII, LLC. (pcs) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against PFL VII, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13749288, filed by Howard Cohan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Sconzo, Gregory) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER re #13 Notice (Other) filed by Howard Cohan, 12 Status Conference, (Joint Notice of Compliance due 12/28/2020). Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 12/15/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE by Howard Cohan of Non-Settlement (Sconzo, Gregory) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • Docket(#12) PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Roy K. Altman: Status Conference held on 12/14/2020. Total time in court: 0 hour(s) : 6 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Gregory Steven Sconzo, Paul J DeBoe, Eric A. Berg, Court Reporter: Francine Salopek, 954-769-5686 / Francine_Salopek@flsd.uscourts.gov. (mpt) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Eric A. Berg may appear and participate in this action on behalf of Defendant PFL VII, LLC. The Clerk shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to Eric Berg at eric.berg@ogletree.com. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 12/14/2020. (hhr) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 the Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. The Defendant shall file a responsive pleading by December 28, 2020. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 12/11/2020. (mpt) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Eric Berg. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14014710 by PFL VII, LLC. Responses due by 12/28/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DeBoe, Paul) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCES: Status Conference set for 12/14/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Roy K. Altman. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 12/8/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by PFL VII, LLC. Attorney Paul J DeBoe added to party PFL VII, LLC(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeBoe, Paul) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES Joint Scheduling Report due by 12/22/2020 Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 12/1/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 the Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. The Defendant shall serve a responsive pleading by December 7, 2020. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 12/1/2020. (mpt) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Howard Cohan. Responses due by 12/15/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sconzo, Gregory) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to PFL VII, LLC. (pcs) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against PFL VII, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13749288, filed by Howard Cohan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Sconzo, Gregory) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less