This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/10/2020 at 07:32:46 (UTC).

Cohan v. Host Hotels & Resorts, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/11/2020 Cohan filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Host Hotels Resorts, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jorge L. Alonso. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-05397

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jorge L. Alonso

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Howard Cohan

Defendants

Host Hotels & Resorts, Inc.

Chicago Marriott Suites Downers Grove

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Marshall J. Burt

Attorney at The Burt Law Group, Ltd.

77 West Washington Street, Suite 1300

Chicago, IL 60602

Defendant Attorney

Kevin Andrew Fritz

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

233 South Wacker Drive, Suite 8000

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Telephonic status hearing set for 12/1/20 at 9:30 a.m. The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 11/27/20. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is 888-808-6929 and the access code is 4911854. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Host Hotels & Resorts, Inc. by Kevin Andrew Fritz (Fritz, Kevin) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Howard Cohan. Host Hotels & Resorts, Inc. waiver sent on 9/21/2020, answer due 11/20/2020. (Burt, Marshall) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Host Hotels & Resorts on 09/21/2020 by Plaintiff Howard Cohan. Waiver of service due by 10/21/2020. (Burt, Marshall) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mp, ) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Howard Cohan by Marshall J. Burt (Burt, Marshall) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Burt, Marshall) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Howard Cohan ; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17425745.(Burt, Marshall) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Host Hotels & Resorts Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marshall J. Burt