This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/03/2022 at 06:47:10 (UTC).

Cohan v. First Watch Restaurants, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 Cohan filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against First Watch Restaurants, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory A. Presnell and Embry J. Kidd. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00135

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory A. Presnell

Referral Judge

Embry J. Kidd

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Howard Cohan

Defendant

First Watch Restaurants, Inc. a Foreign Profit Corporation doing business as First Watch Restaurant #98

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory Steven Sconzo

Attorney at Sconzo Law Office, P.A.

3825 Pga Blvd, Suite 207

Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410

Defendant Attorneys

Joyce Ackerbaum Cox

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Suite 2300, 200 S Orange Ave.

Orlando, FL 32801

Nailah Donnaye Bowen

Attorney at Baker Hostetler

200 S. Orange Avenue, 2300

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Howard Cohan. (Sconzo, Gregory) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

#16

(#16) ORDER dismissing case without prejudice re #15 Notice of settlement. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/11/2022. (LAM) (AKC). (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of settlement by Howard Cohan (Sconzo, Gregory) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

14 #2

Exhibit PACER Search

14 #1

Exhibit Photographs

#14

(#14) ANSWER to court interrogatories by Howard Cohan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Photographs, #2 Exhibit PACER Search)(Sconzo, Gregory) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by First Watch Restaurants, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Bowen, Nailah) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Interested persons order by First Watch Restaurants, Inc.. (Bowen, Nailah) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Joyce Ackerbaum Cox on behalf of First Watch Restaurants, Inc. (Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#10

(#10) ADA SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/1/2022. (LAM) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#9

(#9) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER to Defendant. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 3/15/2022. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/1/2022. (LAM) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#8

(#8) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by First Watch Restaurants, Inc..(Bowen, Nailah) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#7

(#7) RETURN of service executed on 02/07/2022 by Howard Cohan as to First Watch Restaurants, Inc.. (Sconzo, Gregory) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Howard Cohan. (Sconzo, Gregory) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Howard Cohan. Related case(s): No (Sconzo, Gregory) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against First Watch Restaurants, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-19148625) filed by Howard Cohan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Sconzo, Gregory) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ENDORSED ORDER dismissing case with prejudice re #17 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/26/2022. (LAM) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Howard Cohan. (Sconzo, Gregory) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER dismissing case without prejudice re #15 Notice of settlement. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/11/2022. (LAM) (AKC). (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of settlement by Howard Cohan (Sconzo, Gregory) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to court interrogatories by Howard Cohan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Photographs, #2 Exhibit PACER Search)(Sconzo, Gregory) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by First Watch Restaurants, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Bowen, Nailah) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Interested persons order by First Watch Restaurants, Inc.. (Bowen, Nailah) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Joyce Ackerbaum Cox on behalf of First Watch Restaurants, Inc. (Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ADA SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/1/2022. (LAM) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER to Defendant. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 3/15/2022. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/1/2022. (LAM) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by First Watch Restaurants, Inc..(Bowen, Nailah) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RETURN of service executed on 02/07/2022 by Howard Cohan as to First Watch Restaurants, Inc.. (Sconzo, Gregory) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Howard Cohan. (Sconzo, Gregory) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Howard Cohan. Related case(s): No (Sconzo, Gregory) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS issued as to First Watch Restaurants, Inc. (BD) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 1/24/2022. (DS) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:22-cv-0135-GAP-EJK. (SJB) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against First Watch Restaurants, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-19148625) filed by Howard Cohan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Sconzo, Gregory) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where First Watch Restaurants, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nailah Donnaye Bowen