This case was last updated from PACER on 09/28/2020 at 08:41:32 (UTC).

Cohan v. Commercial Foods, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/30/2020 Cohan filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Commercial Foods, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Roy K. Altman and Patrick M. Hunt. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-61543

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Roy K. Altman

Referral Judge

Patrick M. Hunt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Howard Cohan

Defendant

Commercial Foods, Inc. doing business as McDonald's

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason Stuart Weiss

Attorney at Weiss Law Group, PA

5531 N. University Drive, Suite 103

Coral Springs, FL 33067

Defendant Attorney

Justin Canner Sorel

Attorney at Cole Scott & Kissane

1645 Palm Beach Lakes Boulevard, 2Nd Floor

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER of Dismissal With Prejudice. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 9/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Howard Cohan (Weiss, Jason) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER. The above-styled action is administratively CLOSED without prejudice to the parties to file a stipulation of dismissal on or before October 11, 2020. All pending deadlines and hearings are TERMINATED, and any pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 9/11/2020. See attached document for full details. (ebz) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCES Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/24/2020 02:50 PM before Judge Roy K. Altman. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 9/9/2020. See attached document for full details. (ebz) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Settlement by Howard Cohan (Weiss, Jason) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES Joint Scheduling Report due by 9/14/2020 Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 8/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (ebz) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#6

(#6) Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Commercial Foods, Inc.. Attorney Justin Canner Sorel added to party Commercial Foods, Inc.(pty:dft). (Sorel, Justin) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #4 Order by Jason Stuart Weiss on behalf of Howard Cohan (Weiss, Jason) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER REQUIRING VERIFIED CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL REGARDING ANY PRIOR FILINGS UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 7/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (ebz) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Commercial Foods, Inc.. (ebz) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Commercial Foods, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13269202, filed by Howard Cohan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Weiss, Jason) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER of Dismissal With Prejudice. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 9/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Howard Cohan (Weiss, Jason) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER. The above-styled action is administratively CLOSED without prejudice to the parties to file a stipulation of dismissal on or before October 11, 2020. All pending deadlines and hearings are TERMINATED, and any pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 9/11/2020. See attached document for full details. (ebz) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCES Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/24/2020 02:50 PM before Judge Roy K. Altman. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 9/9/2020. See attached document for full details. (ebz) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Settlement by Howard Cohan (Weiss, Jason) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES Joint Scheduling Report due by 9/14/2020 Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 8/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (ebz) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Commercial Foods, Inc.. Attorney Justin Canner Sorel added to party Commercial Foods, Inc.(pty:dft). (Sorel, Justin) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #4 Order by Jason Stuart Weiss on behalf of Howard Cohan (Weiss, Jason) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REQUIRING VERIFIED CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL REGARDING ANY PRIOR FILINGS UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 7/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (ebz) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Commercial Foods, Inc.. (ebz) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Commercial Foods, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13269202, filed by Howard Cohan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Weiss, Jason) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less