This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/21/2023 at 08:20:37 (UTC).

Cohan v. Comcast Cable Communications, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/22/2022 Cohan filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Comcast Cable Communications, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Aileen M. Cannon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:22-CV-81829

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Aileen M. Cannon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Howard Cohan

Defendant

Comcast Cable Communications, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason Stuart Weiss

Defendant Attorney

Beth Hilary Storper Joseph

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summon(s)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Comcast Cable Communications, LLC. (nwn) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketReset Deadlines Comcast Cable Communications, LLC answer due 2/8/2023. Per DE#7. (cqs) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. On or before February 8, 2023, Defendant shall file its Answer or Response to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 . No further extensions of this deadline will be granted absent exceptional circumstances. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 1/18/2023. (aes) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Comcast Cable Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Storper Joseph, Beth) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketReset Deadlines Comcast Cable Communications, LLC answer due 1/18/2023. Per DE#5. (cqs) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time. On or before January 18, 2023, Defendant shall file its answer or response to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 12/27/2022. (aes) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Comcast Cable Communications, LLC. Attorney Beth Hilary Storper Joseph added to party Comcast Cable Communications, LLC(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Storper Joseph, Beth) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Comcast Cable Communications, LLC. (nwn) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nwn) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Comcast Cable Communications, LLC. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16120997, filed by Howard Cohan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Weiss, Jason) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less