This case was last updated from PACER on 12/14/2020 at 07:26:35 (UTC).

Cohan v. CM Chicago, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/15/2020 Cohan filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against CM Chicago, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Franklin U. Valderrama. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-06134

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Franklin U. Valderrama

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Howard Cohan

Defendant

CM CHICAGO, LLC doing business as Radisson Blue Aqua Hotel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Marshall J. Burt

Attorney at The Burt Law Group, Ltd.

77 West Washington Street, Suite 1300

Chicago, IL 60602

Defendant Attorneys

Becky Lynn Kalas

Attorney at Ford & Harrison LLP

180 N Stetson Ave., Suite 1660

Chicago, IL 60601

Craig R. Thorstenson

Attorney at Ford & Harrison LLP

180 N Stetson Ave., Suite 1660

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

8 #1

Joint Status Report

#8

(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: On or before 12/29/2020, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Joint Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Valderrama's name and then again on the link entitled 'Joint Initial Status Report.' The court will enter a scheduling order in response. Plaintiff must serve this Minute Entry on all other parties. If the defendant(s) has not been served with process, plaintiff's counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at analeah_charles@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reschedule the Joint Initial Status Report deadline. Plaintiff should not file the Joint Initial Status Report before the defendant(s) has been served with process. The parties are further ordered to review all of Judge Valderrama's standing orders and the information available on his webpage. Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Joint Status Report) (axc). (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Howard Cohan. CM Chicago, LLC waiver sent on 10/15/2020, answer due 12/14/2020. (Burt, Marshall) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant CM Chicago, LLC by Becky Lynn Kalas (Kalas, Becky) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant CM Chicago, LLC by Craig R. Thorstenson (Thorstenson, Craig) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#4

(#4) REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to CM Chicago, LLC c/o Illinois Corporation Service, Reg. Agent on 10/15/2020 by Plaintiff Howard Cohan. Waiver of service due by 11/16/2020. (Burt, Marshall) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Howard Cohan by Marshall J. Burt (Burt, Marshall) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Burt, Marshall) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Howard Cohan ; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17545551.(Burt, Marshall) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: On or before 12/29/2020, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Joint Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Valderrama's name and then again on the link entitled 'Joint Initial Status Report.' The court will enter a scheduling order in response. Plaintiff must serve this Minute Entry on all other parties. If the defendant(s) has not been served with process, plaintiff's counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at analeah_charles@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reschedule the Joint Initial Status Report deadline. Plaintiff should not file the Joint Initial Status Report before the defendant(s) has been served with process. The parties are further ordered to review all of Judge Valderrama's standing orders and the information available on his webpage. Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Joint Status Report) (axc). (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Howard Cohan. CM Chicago, LLC waiver sent on 10/15/2020, answer due 12/14/2020. (Burt, Marshall) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant CM Chicago, LLC by Becky Lynn Kalas (Kalas, Becky) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant CM Chicago, LLC by Craig R. Thorstenson (Thorstenson, Craig) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to CM Chicago, LLC c/o Illinois Corporation Service, Reg. Agent on 10/15/2020 by Plaintiff Howard Cohan. Waiver of service due by 11/16/2020. (Burt, Marshall) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, ) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Howard Cohan by Marshall J. Burt (Burt, Marshall) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Burt, Marshall) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Howard Cohan ; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17545551.(Burt, Marshall) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less