This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 06:43:12 (UTC).

CogniPower LLC v. Fantasia Trading LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/18/2019 CogniPower LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Fantasia Trading LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02293

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CogniPower LLC

Defendants

Fantasia Trading LLC

Anker Innovations Limited

Fantasia Trading LLC doing business as AnkerDirect

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bradley Paul Lehman

Attorney at Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard, P.A.

500 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1410

Wilmington, DE 19801

Michael F. Bonkowski

Attorney at Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard, P.A.

500 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1410

Wilmington, DE 19801

Defendant Attorney

Warren K. Mabey, Jr.

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, P.C.

222 Delaware Avenue, 17Th Floor, P.O. Box 1114

Wilmington, DE 19899-1114

 

Court Documents

9 #1

Exhibit 1

#9

(#9) OPENING BRIEF in Support re #8 MOTION to Stay filed by Fantasia Trading LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/24/2020. (Mabey, Warren) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/10/2020: #1 Exhibit 1) (nmf, ). (Entered: 02/10/2020)

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#8

(#8) MOTION to Stay - filed by Fantasia Trading LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mabey, Warren) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Fantasia Trading LLC.(Mabey, Warren) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME AND PROPOSED ORDER TO ANSWER COMPLAINT to February 10, 2020 - filed by CogniPower LLC. (Lehman, Bradley) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by CogniPower LLC. Fantasia Trading LLC served on 12/20/2019, answer due 1/10/2020. (Lehman, Bradley) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Lawson Labs, Inc. for CogniPower LLC filed by CogniPower LLC. (kmd) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) RE47,031; RE47,713. (kmd) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A through D

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed with Jury Demand against Anker Innovations Limited, Fantasia Trading LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2805452.) - filed by CogniPower LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A through D, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRECTING ENTRY: Exhibit 1 has been attached to the Opening Brief in Support of the Motion to Stay at D.I. #9 . (nmf) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) OPENING BRIEF in Support re #8 MOTION to Stay filed by Fantasia Trading LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/24/2020. (Mabey, Warren) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/10/2020: #1 Exhibit 1) (nmf, ). (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Stay - filed by Fantasia Trading LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mabey, Warren) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Fantasia Trading LLC.(Mabey, Warren) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME AND PROPOSED ORDER TO ANSWER COMPLAINT to February 10, 2020 filed by CogniPower LLC. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Anker Innovations Limited answer due 2/10/2020; Fantasia Trading LLC answer due 2/10/2020. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/9/2020. (fms) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME AND PROPOSED ORDER TO ANSWER COMPLAINT to February 10, 2020 - filed by CogniPower LLC. (Lehman, Bradley) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by CogniPower LLC. Fantasia Trading LLC served on 12/20/2019, answer due 1/10/2020. (Lehman, Bradley) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Anker Innovations Limited on 12/19/2019; Fantasia Trading LLC on 12/19/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (kmd) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Lawson Labs, Inc. for CogniPower LLC filed by CogniPower LLC. (kmd) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) RE47,031; RE47,713. (kmd) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed with Jury Demand against Anker Innovations Limited, Fantasia Trading LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2805452.) - filed by CogniPower LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A through D, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fantasia Trading LLC doing business as AnkerDirect is a litigant

Latest cases where Anker Innovations Limited is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael F. Bonkowski