This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/04/2022 at 07:15:01 (UTC).

Cofield v. Bailen et al

Case Summary

On 08/12/2022 Cofield filed an Other lawsuit against Bailen. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephanie A. Gallagher. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02030

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephanie A. Gallagher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Debtor

Dr. Keenan K. Cofield

Rosedale, MD 21237

Defendants

Baker & Hostetler LLP

Mark I Bailen

Washington, DC 20036

Michael K. Farrell

Kendall C. Kash

Emily S. Baxter

22 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Mark Bailen

Attorney at Law Offices of Mark I Bailen PC

1250 Connecticut Avenue, Nw, Suite 700

Washington, DC 20036

Other Attorneys

Halle Gray

Attorney at Pessin Katz Law, P.A. (PK Law)

10500 Little Patuxent Parkway, Suite 650

Columbia, MD 21044

 

Court Documents

#39

(#39) ORDER Granting #13 Motion to Dismiss; Denying #16 Motion to Remand to State Court; Granting #22 Motion to Dismiss; Denying #26 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 9/29/2022. (c/m 9/29/2022 bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

#38

(#38) MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 9/29/2022. (c/m 9/29/2022 bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

#26

(#39) ORDER Granting #13 Motion to Dismiss; Denying #16 Motion to Remand to State Court; Granting #22 Motion to Dismiss; Denying #26 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 9/29/2022. (c/m 9/29/2022 bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

22 #1

Text of Proposed Order

22 #22

Main Document

#16

(#34) RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Mark I Bailen, Baker & Hostetler LLP, Emily S. Baxter, Michael K. Farrell, Kendall C. Kash. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bailen, Mark) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

13 #2

Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss

13 #1

Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss

13 #13

Main Document

#5

(#5) Summons Issued 30 days as to Mark I Bailen, Baker & Hostetler LLP, Emily S. Baxter, Annie Davis, John or Jane Doe-Driver of Dump Truck #26, Michael K. Farrell, Suan P. Griffith, Kendall C. Kash, Kevin McNeil, Pessin Katz Law, P.A., Progressive Claims, Progressive Claims Dept., Progressive Claims Dept. The Progressive Corporation, Progressive Claims The Progressive Corporation, Progressive Insurance, Progressive Insurance The Progressive Corporation, Progressive Insurance & Claims Company The Progressive Corporation-Progressive Casualty Insurance Co., Progressive Insurance Claims, Progressive Insurance Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Insurance Progressive Commercial Casualty Company, Progressive Insurance Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Glenn M. Renwick, Nicole Winter, Work time, Inc./Owners/Operators, Worktime Inc. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

#4

(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mark I Bailen, Baker & Hostetler LLP, Emily S. Baxter, Annie Davis, John or Jane Doe-Driver of Dump Truck #26, Michael K. Farrell, Suan P. Griffith, Kendall C. Kash, Kevin McNeil, Pessin Katz Law, P.A., Progressive Claims, Progressive Claims Dept., Progressive Claims Dept. The Progressive Corporation, Progressive Claims The Progressive Corporation, Progressive Insurance, Progressive Insurance The Progressive Corporation, Progressive Insurance & Claims Company The Progressive Corporation-Progressive Casualty Insurance Co., Progressive Insurance Claims, Progressive Insurance Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Insurance Progressive Commercial Casualty Company, Progressive Insurance Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Glenn M. Renwick, Nicole Winter, Work time, Inc./Owners/Operators, Worktime Inc., filed by Keenan K. Cofield.(dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT against Mark I Bailen, Baker & Hostetler LLP, Emily S. Baxter, Annie Davis, Michael K. Farrell, Suan P. Griffith, Kendall C. Kash, Kevin McNeil, Pessin Katz Law, P.A., Progressive Claims, Progressive Claims Dept., Progressive Claims Dept. The Progressive Corporation, Progressive Claims The Progressive Corporation, Progressive Insurance, Progressive Insurance The Progressive Corporation, Progressive Insurance & Claims Company The Progressive Corporation-Progressive Casualty Insurance Co., Progressive Insurance Claims, Progressive Insurance Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Insurance Progressive Commercial Casualty Company, Progressive Insurance Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Glenn M. Renwick, filed by Keenan K. Cofield.(dass, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 8/15/2022 (dass, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 08/15/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE by Mark I Bailen, Baker & Hostetler LLP, Progressive Casualty Insurance, Progressive Commercial Casualty Company, Progressive Corporation, Progressive Insurance Claims re #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet (Including Related Case Number) (Bailen, Mark) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

1 #4

Exhibit D - State Summons

1 #3

Exhibit C - Line Item, Amended Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit B - State Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit A - Uth Declaration

1 #1

Main Document

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) ORDER Granting #13 Motion to Dismiss; Denying #16 Motion to Remand to State Court; Granting #22 Motion to Dismiss; Denying #26 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 9/29/2022. (c/m 9/29/2022 bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 9/29/2022. (c/m 9/29/2022 bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Supplement to #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Keenan K. Cofield (bas, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 9/23/2022 (bas, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 09/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Pessin Katz Law, P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gray, Halle) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Supplement to #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Keenan K. Cofield (bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Mark I Bailen, Baker & Hostetler LLP, Emily S. Baxter, Michael K. Farrell, Kendall C. Kash. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bailen, Mark) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER denying #30 Motion to Disqualify Judge. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 8/29/2022. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/nef) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 8/29/2022. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/nef) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) PAPERLESS ORDER Approving #29 Notice to Withdraw filed by Worktime, Inc., Motions terminated: #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Work time, Inc./Owners/Operators, Worktime Inc... Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 8/26/2022. (bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MOTION to Disqualify Judge by Keenan K. Cofield(bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Consent to receive notice and service electronically by Keenan K. Cofield. The Court recommends that all documents received electronically be printed or saved for future reference.(kk5s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. Judge George Levi Russell, III no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded #here. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m 8/16/22) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Removal Notification Letter mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketTHE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (3-5) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE CITY. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued 30 days as to Mark I Bailen, Baker & Hostetler LLP, Emily S. Baxter, Annie Davis, John or Jane Doe-Driver of Dump Truck #26, Michael K. Farrell, Suan P. Griffith, Kendall C. Kash, Kevin McNeil, Pessin Katz Law, P.A., Progressive Claims, Progressive Claims Dept., Progressive Claims Dept. The Progressive Corporation, Progressive Claims The Progressive Corporation, Progressive Insurance, Progressive Insurance The Progressive Corporation, Progressive Insurance & Claims Company The Progressive Corporation-Progressive Casualty Insurance Co., Progressive Insurance Claims, Progressive Insurance Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Insurance Progressive Commercial Casualty Company, Progressive Insurance Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Glenn M. Renwick, Nicole Winter, Work time, Inc./Owners/Operators, Worktime Inc. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mark I Bailen, Baker & Hostetler LLP, Emily S. Baxter, Annie Davis, John or Jane Doe-Driver of Dump Truck #26, Michael K. Farrell, Suan P. Griffith, Kendall C. Kash, Kevin McNeil, Pessin Katz Law, P.A., Progressive Claims, Progressive Claims Dept., Progressive Claims Dept. The Progressive Corporation, Progressive Claims The Progressive Corporation, Progressive Insurance, Progressive Insurance The Progressive Corporation, Progressive Insurance & Claims Company The Progressive Corporation-Progressive Casualty Insurance Co., Progressive Insurance Claims, Progressive Insurance Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Insurance Progressive Commercial Casualty Company, Progressive Insurance Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Glenn M. Renwick, Nicole Winter, Work time, Inc./Owners/Operators, Worktime Inc., filed by Keenan K. Cofield.(dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against Mark I Bailen, Baker & Hostetler LLP, Emily S. Baxter, Annie Davis, Michael K. Farrell, Suan P. Griffith, Kendall C. Kash, Kevin McNeil, Pessin Katz Law, P.A., Progressive Claims, Progressive Claims Dept., Progressive Claims Dept. The Progressive Corporation, Progressive Claims The Progressive Corporation, Progressive Insurance, Progressive Insurance The Progressive Corporation, Progressive Insurance & Claims Company The Progressive Corporation-Progressive Casualty Insurance Co., Progressive Insurance Claims, Progressive Insurance Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Insurance Progressive Commercial Casualty Company, Progressive Insurance Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Glenn M. Renwick, filed by Keenan K. Cofield.(dass, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 8/15/2022 (dass, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by Mark I Bailen, Baker & Hostetler LLP, Progressive Casualty Insurance, Progressive Commercial Casualty Company, Progressive Corporation, Progressive Insurance Claims re #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet (Including Related Case Number) (Bailen, Mark) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City, Maryland, case number 24-C-22-003015. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10099866), filed by Progressive Insurance Claims, Progressive Corporation, Progressive Commercial Casualty Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Uth Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - State Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Line Item, Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - State Summons)(Bailen, Mark) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Baker Hostetler, LLP is a litigant