This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/12/2021 at 15:10:19 (UTC).

Coffman v. Walsh et al

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 Coffman filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Walsh. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Annemarie Carney Axon and Gray M Borden. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00517

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Annemarie Carney Axon

Referral Judge

Gray M Borden

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Deangelo Antwan Coffman

Bessemer, AL 35023

Defendants

Bizzle

Byess

Walsh

Shannon Walsh

Chernell Bizzell

Gabrielle Byess

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Philip G Piggott

Attorney at WEBSTER HENRY

Two Perimeter Park South, Ste. 445 East

Birmingham, AL 35243

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER re #11 - For good cause, the motion for leave to file the special report and confidential mental health records under seal is GRANTED. Upon filing, the moving defendants shall serve a copy of the sealed records and special report on the plaintiff by mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 6/10/2021. (KEK) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

#15

(#15) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Shannon Walsh. filed by Shannon Walsh (Piggott, Philip) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

#14

(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gabrielle Byess. filed by Gabrielle Byess (Piggott, Philip) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

#13

(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chernell Bizzell. filed by Chernell Bizzell (Piggott, Philip) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Chernell Bizzell, Gabrielle Byess, Shannon Walsh.(Piggott, Philip) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

#11

(#11) MOTION to File Special Report Under Seal by Chernell Bizzell, Gabrielle Byess, Shannon Walsh. (Piggott, Philip) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

10 #1

Exhibit A

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Byess. Byess waiver sent on 6/8/2021, answer due 8/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Piggott, Philip) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

9 #1

Exhibit A

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Bizzle. Bizzle waiver sent on 6/8/2021, answer due 8/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Piggott, Philip) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

8 #1

Exhibit A

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Walsh. Walsh waiver sent on 6/8/2021, answer due 8/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Piggott, Philip) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT within 60 days from the date of this order; copies mailed to plaintiff; mailed with complaint to named defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 6/1/2021. (KAM) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER that the court having received prisoner consent form the Warden is directed to deduct Monthly Payments from Prison Account of Deangelo Antwan Coffman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 5/26/2021. (KEK) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

#5

(#5) PRISONER CONSENT FORM filed by Deangelo Antwan Coffman. (KEK) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of filing: letter and documents re filing fee by Deangelo Antwan Coffman. (KEK) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Bizzle, Byess, Walsh, filed by Deangelo Antwan Coffman.(KEK) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ***Document Sealed - SPECIAL REPORT filed by defendants Shannon Walsh, Gabrielle Byess, and Chernell Bizzell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, part 1, #3 Exhibit A-1, part 2, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C) (KEK) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER re #11 - For good cause, the motion for leave to file the special report and confidential mental health records under seal is GRANTED. Upon filing, the moving defendants shall serve a copy of the sealed records and special report on the plaintiff by mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 6/10/2021. (KEK) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Shannon Walsh. filed by Shannon Walsh (Piggott, Philip) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gabrielle Byess. filed by Gabrielle Byess (Piggott, Philip) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chernell Bizzell. filed by Chernell Bizzell (Piggott, Philip) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Chernell Bizzell, Gabrielle Byess, Shannon Walsh.(Piggott, Philip) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to File Special Report Under Seal by Chernell Bizzell, Gabrielle Byess, Shannon Walsh. (Piggott, Philip) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Byess. Byess waiver sent on 6/8/2021, answer due 8/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Piggott, Philip) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Bizzle. Bizzle waiver sent on 6/8/2021, answer due 8/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Piggott, Philip) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Walsh. Walsh waiver sent on 6/8/2021, answer due 8/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Piggott, Philip) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT within 60 days from the date of this order; copies mailed to plaintiff; mailed with complaint to named defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 6/1/2021. (KAM) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER that the court having received prisoner consent form the Warden is directed to deduct Monthly Payments from Prison Account of Deangelo Antwan Coffman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 5/26/2021. (KEK) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 3.16, receipt number B4601113359. (KEK) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PRISONER CONSENT FORM filed by Deangelo Antwan Coffman. (KEK) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of filing: letter and documents re filing fee by Deangelo Antwan Coffman. (KEK) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER - The plaintiff has submitted an application to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by certified copies of his jail and/or prison account statements. Doc. #2 . The application is GRANTED, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b). The plaintiff is ORDERED to pay an initial partial filing fee of $3.16 in order to commence this action, and thereafter to make monthly installment payments toward payment of the full filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 4/19/20201. (KEK) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Deangelo Antwan Coffman. (KEK) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Bizzle, Byess, Walsh, filed by Deangelo Antwan Coffman.(KEK) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Walsh Co. Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Philip Piggott