This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/14/2021 at 07:49:43 (UTC).

Coffman v. Boston Private Financial Holdings, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 Coffman filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Boston Private Financial Holdings, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kandis A. Westmore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-01791

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kandis A. Westmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Catherine Coffman

Defendants

Lizabeth H. Zlatkus

Anthony DeChellis

Luis A. Ubinas

Gloria C. Larson

Stephen M. Waters

Kimberly S. Stevenson

Mark F. Furlong

Deborah F. Kuenstner

Boston Private Financial Holdings, Inc.

Joseph C. Guyaux

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joel E. Elkins

Attorney at WeissLaw LLP

9100 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 725 E.

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

2 #1

List of Defendants

#3

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Catherine Coffman.. (Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 4/19/2021) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 5/3/2021. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2021) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 4/14/2021. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2021) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/8/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/15/2021 01:30 PM. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2021) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Boston Private Financial Holdings, Inc., Anthony DeChellis, Mark F. Furlong, Joseph C. Guyaux, Deborah F. Kuenstner, Gloria C. Larson, Kimberly S. Stevenson, Luis A. Ubinas, Stephen M. Waters, Lizabeth H. Zlatkus. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2021) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/29/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2021) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Catherine Coffman re #1 Complaint, (Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 3/15/2021) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 List of Defendants)(Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 3/15/2021) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Boston Private Financial Holdings, Inc., Anthony DeChellis, Mark F. Furlong, Joseph C. Guyaux, Deborah F. Kuenstner, Gloria C. Larson, Kimberly S. Stevenson, Luis A. Ubinas, Stephen M. Waters, Lizabeth H. Zlatkus ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15701909.). Filed byCatherine Coffman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 3/15/2021) Modified on 3/16/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Boston Private Financial Holdings, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joel E. Elkins