This case was last updated from PACER on 04/21/2019 at 07:26:38 (UTC).

Coffield v. Hall

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 Coffield filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Hall. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kathleen M. Williams and Lisette M. Reid. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-60444

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kathleen M. Williams

Referral Judge

Lisette M. Reid

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Benjamin Coffield

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33310

Defendant

Jillian Elizabeth Hall

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ORDER REQUIRING PAYMENT OF FILING FEE OR FILING OF MOTION TO PROCEED IFP WITH DETAILED AFFIDAVIT. Filing Fee due by 3/18/2019. Motions due by 3/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 2/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS LITIGANTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 2/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

#1

(#1) Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Jillian Elizabeth Hall. Filing fee $ 350.00 not paid/no ifp filed, filed by Benjamin Coffield.(drz) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#5

(#5) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 42 USC 1983 case re #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens filed by Benjamin Coffield; not recommending permanently barring Plaintiff from bringing a meritorious claim, simply recommending dismissing the case without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 4/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 4/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (br) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 42 USC 1983 case re #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens filed by Benjamin Coffield; not recommending permanently barring Plaintiff from bringing a meritorious claim, simply recommending dismissing the case without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 4/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 4/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (br) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER REQUIRING PAYMENT OF FILING FEE OR FILING OF MOTION TO PROCEED IFP WITH DETAILED AFFIDAVIT. Filing Fee due by 3/18/2019. Motions due by 3/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 2/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS LITIGANTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 2/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (drz) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Jillian Elizabeth Hall. Filing fee $ 350.00 not paid/no ifp filed, filed by Benjamin Coffield.(drz) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.