This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 08:15:13 (UTC).

Coffeeconnexion Company, Inc., The v. Benjamin Foods, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 Coffeeconnexion Company, Inc , The filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Benjamin Foods, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alistair Newbern and William L. Campbell, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01134

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alistair Newbern

Presiding Judge

William L. Campbell, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Coffeeconnexion Company, Inc., The

Defendants

Benjamin Foods, LLC

David Salib

Howard Klayman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John A. Beam, III

Attorney at Equitus Law Alliance, PLLC

P O Box 280240, 709 Taylor Street

Nashville, TN 37228-0240

Desiree Julein Clark Goff

Attorney at Equitus Law Alliance, PLLC

P O Box 280240, 709 Taylor Street

Nashville, TN 37228-0240

Defendant Attorney

John W. Reis

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP (Charlotte Office)

101 N. Tryon Street, Suite 1300

Charlotte, NC 28246

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) ORDER granting #24 Motion for Clarification and to Postpone Case Management Conference. The initial case management conference is RESET for April 7, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. The parties shall file their joint proposed initial case management order by April 2, 2020. Defendants may respond to the amended complaint by March 2, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 2/14/2020. (dt) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#25

(#25) RESPONSE to Motion re #24 MOTION to Clarify re #20 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by Coffeeconnexion Company, Inc., The. (Goff, Desiree) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

24 #1

Attachment Proposed Order

#24

(#24) MOTION to Clarify re #20 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer by Benjamin Foods, LLC, Howard Klayman, David Salib. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Reis, John) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

23 #1

Exhibit A - Unpaid Invoices

#23

(#23) AMENDED AND RESTATED COMPLAINT against Benjamin Foods, LLC, Howard Klayman and David Salib, filed by The Coffeeconnexion Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Unpaid Invoices)(dt) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

#22

(#22) ORDER: The Motion to Amend Pleadings #21 is GRANTED as a matter of right pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1)(B). The Clerk's Office is DIRECTED to file the attached amended complaint as a separate docket entry. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 2/4/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

#21

(#21) MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Coffeeconnexion Company, Inc., The. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex. A to Amended Complaint, Unpaid Invoices)(Goff, Desiree) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#20

(#20) ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the #1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 1/30/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by John W. Reis on behalf of Benjamin Foods, LLC, Howard Klayman, David Salib (Reis, John) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 12/18/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#6

(#6) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Coffeeconnexion Company, Inc., The. (Goff, Desiree) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#5

(#5) Summons issued as to Benjamin Foods, LLC, Howard Klayman, David Salib. (Service copies picked up by counsel.)(dt) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/18/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (dt) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

1 #1

Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#20) ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the #1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 1/30/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER granting #24 Motion for Clarification and to Postpone Case Management Conference. The initial case management conference is RESET for April 7, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. The parties shall file their joint proposed initial case management order by April 2, 2020. Defendants may respond to the amended complaint by March 2, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 2/14/2020. (dt) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) RESPONSE to Motion re #24 MOTION to Clarify re #20 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by Coffeeconnexion Company, Inc., The. (Goff, Desiree) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION to Clarify re #20 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer by Benjamin Foods, LLC, Howard Klayman, David Salib. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Reis, John) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) AMENDED AND RESTATED COMPLAINT against Benjamin Foods, LLC, Howard Klayman and David Salib, filed by The Coffeeconnexion Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Unpaid Invoices)(dt) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER: The Motion to Amend Pleadings #21 is GRANTED as a matter of right pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1)(B). The Clerk's Office is DIRECTED to file the attached amended complaint as a separate docket entry. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 2/4/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Coffeeconnexion Company, Inc., The. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex. A to Amended Complaint, Unpaid Invoices)(Goff, Desiree) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the #1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 1/30/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Howard Klayman, David Salib. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Reis, John) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) SUMMONS returned executed by Coffeeconnexion Company, Inc., The. David Salib served on 12/20/2019. (Goff, Desiree) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) SUMMONS returned executed by Coffeeconnexion Company, Inc., The. Howard Klayman served on 12/20/2019. (Goff, Desiree) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Benjamin Foods, LLC, Howard Klayman, David Salib. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Reis, John) Modified on 1/9/2020 (dt). (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by John W. Reis on behalf of Benjamin Foods, LLC, Howard Klayman, David Salib (Reis, John) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 12/18/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Coffeeconnexion Company, Inc., The. (Goff, Desiree) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons issued as to Benjamin Foods, LLC, Howard Klayman, David Salib. (Service copies picked up by counsel.)(dt) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/18/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (dt) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for John A. Beam, III and Desiree Julein Clark Goff. (dt) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Benjamin Foods, LLC, Howard Klayman and David Salib (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3051904), filed by Coffeeconnexion Company, Inc., The. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.