This case was last updated from PACER on 11/19/2019 at 08:23:58 (UTC).

Coffee County Board of Commissioners v. McVeigh

Case Summary

On 09/20/2019 Coffee County Board of Commissioners filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against McVeigh. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Benjamin W. Cheesbro and Lisa G. Wood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00080

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Benjamin W. Cheesbro

Presiding Judge

Lisa G. Wood

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, 3Rd Party Defendant and Counter Defendant

Coffee County Board of Commissioners

3Rd Party Plaintiff, Defendant and Counter Claimant

Lovie McVeigh

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, 3Rd Party Defendant and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Anthony A. Rowell

Attorney at Hall Booth Smith, PC

440 College Avenue North, Suite 120

Athens, GA 30601

Virginia N. Hall

Attorney at Hall Booth Smith, PC

440 College Avenue North, Suite 120

Athens, GA 30601

3Rd Party Plaintiff, Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Jeffery Banks

Attorney at Banks & Riedel, P.C.

316 Oak Street

Eastman, GA 31023

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Remand and Conduct Rule 26 Conference. Plaintiff shall file its motion to remand or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's notice of removal on or before 11/19/19. In addition, counsel shall meet and confer regarding Rule 26 obligations on or before 11/19/19 and shall file their Rule 26(f) report within seven days of this meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 10/21/2019. (ca) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Remand by Coffee County Board of Commissioners. Responses due by 10/22/2019. (Rowell, Anthony) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION re #4 Rule 26(f) Order, Set/Reset Deadlines, Set/Reset Deadlines, #5 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, Set/Reset Deadlines, #1 Notice of Removal, by Coffee County Board of Commissioners. (Rowell, Anthony) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony A. Rowell on behalf of Coffee County Board of Commissioners (Rowell, Anthony) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#5

(#5) McVeigh's ANSWER to Complaint , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT AGAINST COFFEE COUNTY against Coffee County Board of Commissioners, COUNTERCLAIM against Coffee County Board of Commissioners by Lovie McVeigh.(Banks, Jeffery) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

3 #1

Correct Attachment

#4

(#4) RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 09/23/2019. (MG) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE To All Counsel Of Record re: #1 Notice of Removal. (MG) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/24/2019: #1 Correct Attachment) (MG). (Entered: 09/23/2019)

#2

(#2) AFFIDAVIT of Virginia N. Hall re #1 Notice of Removal, by Lovie McVeigh. (MG) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

1 #3

Return of Service Unexecuted

1 #2

Plaintiff's Motion And Brief In Support Of Its Motion For Service By Publi

1 #1

Complaint For Injunctive Relief And Damages

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lovie McVeigh from Superior Court of Coffee County, Georgia, case number SUS2019000267. (Filing fee paid on 09/20/2019- $400.00; receipt number 113J-2688432). (Attachments: #1 Complaint For Injunctive Relief And Damages). (MG) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2019: #2 Plaintiff's Motion And Brief In Support Of Its Motion For Service By Publication) (MG). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2019: #3 Return of Service Unexecuted) (MG). (Entered: 09/23/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2019
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Motion to Remand or Response to Notice of Removal due by 11/19/2019. (ca) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Remand and Conduct Rule 26 Conference. Plaintiff shall file its motion to remand or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's notice of removal on or before 11/19/19. In addition, counsel shall meet and confer regarding Rule 26 obligations on or before 11/19/19 and shall file their Rule 26(f) report within seven days of this meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 10/21/2019. (ca) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTIONS REFERRED: #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Remand. (ca) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Remand by Coffee County Board of Commissioners. Responses due by 10/22/2019. (Rowell, Anthony) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STIPULATION re #4 Rule 26(f) Order, Set/Reset Deadlines, Set/Reset Deadlines, #5 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, Set/Reset Deadlines, #1 Notice of Removal, by Coffee County Board of Commissioners. (Rowell, Anthony) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony A. Rowell on behalf of Coffee County Board of Commissioners (Rowell, Anthony) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) McVeigh's ANSWER to Complaint , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT AGAINST COFFEE COUNTY against Coffee County Board of Commissioners, COUNTERCLAIM against Coffee County Board of Commissioners by Lovie McVeigh.(Banks, Jeffery) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Attorney(s) for Plaintiff to submit entry of appearance by 9/30/2019. (MG) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 09/23/2019. (MG) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Refile all pending motions previously filed in State Court due by 10/04/2019. (MG) Modified on 9/24/2019 (MG). (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Lovie McVeigh answer due 9/27/2019. (MG) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE To All Counsel Of Record re: #1 Notice of Removal. (MG) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/24/2019: #1 Correct Attachment) (MG). (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) AFFIDAVIT of Virginia N. Hall re #1 Notice of Removal, by Lovie McVeigh. (MG) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lovie McVeigh from Superior Court of Coffee County, Georgia, case number SUS2019000267. (Filing fee paid on 09/20/2019- $400.00; receipt number 113J-2688432). (Attachments: #1 Complaint For Injunctive Relief And Damages). (MG) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2019: #2 Plaintiff's Motion And Brief In Support Of Its Motion For Service By Publication) (MG). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2019: #3 Return of Service Unexecuted) (MG). (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less