This case was last updated from PACER on 07/27/2019 at 08:04:10 (UTC).

COFFEE BY DESIGN INC v. 4BUSH HOLDINGS LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/28/2019 COFFEE BY DESIGN INC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against 4BUSH HOLDINGS LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maine District. The Judges overseeing this case are NANCY TORRESEN and JOHN C. NIVISON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00241

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maine District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

NANCY TORRESEN

Referral Judge

JOHN C. NIVISON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COFFEE BY DESIGN INC

Defendants

JOHN DOE INDIVIDUALS

JOHN DOE ENTITIES

4BUSH HOLDINGS LLC

DESERT LAKE GROUP LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

EDWARD J. SACKMAN

Attorney at BERNSTEIN, SHUR

670 N. Commercial Street, Suite 108, Po Box 1120

Manchester, NH 03105-1120

PATRICK I. MARASS

Attorney at BERNSTEIN SHUR

100 Middle Street, West Tower, P.O. Box 9729

Portland, ME 04104-5029

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to 4BUSH HOLDINGS LLC served on 7/22/2019; DESERT LAKE GROUP LLC served on 7/22/2019. (MARASS, PATRICK) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by COFFEE BY DESIGN INC. (MARASS, PATRICK) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Edward J. Sackman filed by PATRICK I. MARASS on behalf of COFFEE BY DESIGN INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2026573.) (MARASS, PATRICK) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

#4

(#4) AO FORM 120: REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (bfa) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

3 #1

Desert Lake Group, LLC summons

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to 4BUSH HOLDINGS LLC, DESERT LAKE GROUP LLC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Desert Lake Group, LLC summons)(bfa) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A - Certificates of Registration

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against 4BUSH HOLDINGS LLC, DESERT LAKE GROUP LLC, JOHN DOE ENTITIES, JOHN DOE INDIVIDUALS with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by COFFEE BY DESIGN INC. (Service of Process Deadline 8/26/2019) Fee due by 5/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificates of Registration)(bfa) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2019
  • Set Answer Deadlines for 4BUSH HOLDINGS LLC & DESERT LAKE GROUP LLC - Per Acceptance of Service #7: Answers due by 9/20/2019. (mnw) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to 4BUSH HOLDINGS LLC served on 7/22/2019; DESERT LAKE GROUP LLC served on 7/22/2019. (MARASS, PATRICK) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by COFFEE BY DESIGN INC. (MARASS, PATRICK) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Edward J. Sackman filed by PATRICK I. MARASS on behalf of COFFEE BY DESIGN INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2026573.) (MARASS, PATRICK) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2026486.), filed by COFFEE BY DESIGN INC.(MARASS, PATRICK) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AO FORM 120: REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (bfa) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to 4BUSH HOLDINGS LLC, DESERT LAKE GROUP LLC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Desert Lake Group, LLC summons)(bfa) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/5/2019. (bfa) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against 4BUSH HOLDINGS LLC, DESERT LAKE GROUP LLC, JOHN DOE ENTITIES, JOHN DOE INDIVIDUALS with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by COFFEE BY DESIGN INC. (Service of Process Deadline 8/26/2019) Fee due by 5/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificates of Registration)(bfa) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.