This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 07:46:14

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 05/16/2019 a Prisoner - Prison Condition case was filed by Cody against Jasper Police Department in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District.

Case Details

  • Case Number 6:19-CV-00745
  • Filing Date 05/16/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Prisoner - Prison Condition
  • Jurisdiction U.S. District Courts
  • Judge L Scott Coogler
  • Courthouse Alabama Northern District

Party Details

  • Defendant Walker County Public Defenders
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant Jasper Municipal Court
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Plaintiff Perry Lynn Cody
  • Represented By
    • Self Represented
  • Defendant Jasper Police Department
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant Walker County Courthouse
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER - The plaintiff has submitted applications to pr...

Fees Apply
#10

(#10) NOTICE - attached last page with signature re #1 Compl...

Fees Apply
#9

(#9) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Perry ...

Fees Apply
#8

(#8) ORDER As stated within, the undersigned WITHDRAWS the r...

Fees Apply
#7

(#7) NOTICE of INFORMATION REGARDING PRISONER ACCOUNTS re #3...

Fees Apply
#6

(#6) **** WITHDRAWN **** MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOM...

Fees Apply
3 #1

IFP Application

Fees Apply
#3

(#3) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING The plaintiff's complaint ...

Fees Apply
#2

(#2) MOTION (Application) for Leave to Proceed in forma paup...

Fees Apply
#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with attachment, against Jasper Municipal Cou...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2019
  • (#11) ORDER - The plaintiff has submitted applications to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by certified copies of his jail and/or prison account statements. (Docs. #2 , #7 , #9 ). The application is GRANTED, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b). The undersigned therefore ORDERS the plaintiff to sign and return to the Clerk of Court, within thirty (30) days of the entry date of this Order, the attached Prisoner Consent Form to signify that he wishes to continue with this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 6/28/2019. (KEK) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
  • 06/27/2019
  • (#10) NOTICE - attached last page with signature re #1 Complaint re #8 Order, by Perry Lynn Cody. (KWC) (Entered: 06/27/2019)
  • 06/18/2019
  • (#9) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Perry Lynn Cody. (KWC) (Entered: 06/18/2019)
  • 06/11/2019
  • (#8) ORDER As stated within, the undersigned WITHDRAWS the report and recommendation of dismissal entered on June 3, 2019, #6 . The Clerk is DIRECTED to serve a copy of this Order, a copy of the Order of May 17, 2019, #3 , and a copy of the complaint, #1 , on the plaintiff on the plaintiff at the Walker County Jail. The plaintiff MUST return a signed copy of his complaint within thirty (30) days of the entry date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of this case for want of prosecution. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 6/11/2019. (PSM) (Entered: 06/11/2019)
  • 06/10/2019
  • (#7) NOTICE of INFORMATION REGARDING PRISONER ACCOUNTS re #3 Order by Perry Lynn Cody. (KWC) (Entered: 06/10/2019)
  • 06/03/2019
  • (#6) **** WITHDRAWN **** MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION the undersigned RECOMMENDS that this action be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE due to the plaintiffs failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 6/3/2019. (PSM) Withdrawn per #8 on 6/11/2019 (PSM). (Entered: 06/03/2019)
  • 05/28/2019
  • (#5) Mail (order doc #3 ) Returned as Undeliverable; Return to Sender; OOF. Mail sent to Perry Lynn Cody. (KWC) (Entered: 05/28/2019)
  • 05/28/2019
  • (#4) Mail (notification of case filing) Returned as Undeliverable, Return to Sender, OOF. Mail sent to Perry Lynn Cody. (KWC) (Entered: 05/28/2019)
  • 05/17/2019
  • (#3) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING The plaintiff's complaint and application to in forma pauperis are deficient for the reasons indicated within. The plaintiff must correct the deficient pleadings within thirty (30) days from the entry date of this order, in the manner explained. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 5/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application)(PSM) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
  • 05/16/2019
  • (#2) MOTION (Application) for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Perry Lynn Cody. (KWC) (Entered: 05/16/2019)
  • 05/16/2019
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with attachment, against Jasper Municipal Court, Jasper Police Department, Walker County Courthouse, Walker County Public Defenders, filed by Perry Lynn Cody. (KWC) (NOTE: complaint not signed) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.