This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/31/2020 at 09:50:47 (UTC).

Coding Technologies, LLC v. Cengage Learning, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 Coding Technologies, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Cengage Learning, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Leonard P. Stark and Christopher J. Burke. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00163

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

Referral Judge

Christopher J. Burke

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Coding Technologies, LLC

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Cengage Learning, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Stamatios Stamoulis

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Jeremy Douglas Anderson

Neil J. McNabnay

Ricardo J. Bonilla

Theresa M. Dawson

 

Court Documents

#17

#16

#15

14 #1

Exhibit A

#14

#13

#12

#10

#9

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#8

#7

#5

#4

#3

#2

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Coding Technologies, LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER to #10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Coding Technologies, LLC.(Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Coding Technologies, LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cengage Learning, Inc.- filed by Coding Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Neil J. McNabnay,Ricardo J. Bonilla,Theresa M. Dawson for Cengage Learning, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED D.I. #13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Neil J. McNabnay, Ricardo J. Bonilla, and Theresa M. Dawson filed by Cengage Learning, Inc. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 3/11/2020. (dlb) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Neil J. McNabnay, Ricardo J. Bonilla, and Theresa M. Dawson - filed by Cengage Learning, Inc.. (Anderson, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Cengage Learning Holdings II, Inc., Other Affiliate KKR Asset Management, Other Affiliate KKR & Co., Inc. for Cengage Learning, Inc. filed by Cengage Learning, Inc.. (Anderson, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION REFERRED: #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion referred to Christopher J. Burke.(dlb) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • Docket(#11) ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and discuss, in person and/or by telephone, each of the matters listed on Chief Judge Stark's Case Management Checklist ("Checklist"). Within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, the parties shall jointly file the following: (i) a copy of the "Checklist" indicating the names of Lead Counsel and Delaware Counsel for each party; (ii) a proposed Scheduling Order (consistent with the Chief Judge Stark's Revised Patent Form Scheduling Order); and (iii) a letter, not to exceed three pages, that contains the following: (a) a description of what this case is about; (b) the parties' positions regarding the disputes in the proposed Scheduling Order, and (c) a list of the three most significant topics (other than Scheduling Order disputes) discussed during the parties' review of the Checklist items, along with a brief description as to what was discussed as to those topics. Thereafter, the Court will schedule a Case Management Conference/Rule 16 Scheduling Conference to be held with Judge Stark and/or Judge Burke. The Checklist and Revised Patent Form Scheduling Order can be found on this Court's website (www.ded.uscourts.gov/judge/chief-judge-leonard-p-stark). Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 2/26/2020. (dlb) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED D.I. #7 Proposed Procedure Order filed by Coding Technologies, LLC. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 2/19/2020. (dlb) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PROPOSED ORDER Procedure Order by Coding Technologies, LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • Docket(#6) ORAL REFERRAL ORDER: This case will be governed by Judge Stark's Revised Procedures for Managing Patent Cases (see www.ded.uscourts.gov). In accordance with the Revised Procedures, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. any and all matters relating to scheduling, including entry of a Scheduling Order, are referred to Magistrate Judge Burke; 2. any and all motions to dismiss, stay, and/or transfer venue, relating to all or any part of the case, whenever such motions may be filed, are referred to Judge Burke for disposition or report and recommendation, to the full extent permitted by the Constitution, statute, and rule; and 3. within seven (7) days of the date of this Referral Order, the plaintiff(s) shall file the Procedures Order, which is found on Judge Stark's website (see www.ded.uscourts.gov). ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/12/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00163-LPS, 1:20-cv-00164-LPS (ntl) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Coding Technologies, LLC. Cengage Learning, Inc. served on 2/5/2020, answer due 2/26/2020. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00163-LPS, 1:20-cv-00164-LPS (rjb) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Cengage Learning, Inc. on 2/3/2020. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (lak) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) U.S. 8,540,159 B2. (lak) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Coding Technologies, LLC. (lak) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against Cengage Learning, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2841671.) - filed by Coding Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less