This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/30/2020 at 09:06:12 (UTC).

Coder et al v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/01/2020 Coder filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Scott T. Varholak and Philip A. Brimmer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01237

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Scott T. Varholak

Presiding Judge

Philip A. Brimmer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Norma Coder

John Coder

Defendant

Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard P. Poormon

Attorney at Peters Poormon LLC

1610 Gaylord Street

Denver, CO 80206

James Jude Peters

Attorney at PetersPoormon LLC

1610 Gaylord Street

Denver, CO 80206

Defendant Attorneys

Kurt Hans Henkel

Attorney at Tucker Holmes PC

7400 East Caley Avenue, Quebec Centre Ii, Suite 300

Centennial, CO 80111-6714

Winslow Russell Taylor, III

Attorney at Tucker Holmes PC

7400 East Caley Avenue, Quebec Centre Ii, Suite 300

Centennial, CO 80111-6714

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 6/24/2020. (morti, ) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

#18

(#18) MINUTE ENTRY for Telephonic Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 6/24/2020. Discovery due by 3/19/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 4/23/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/16/2021 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. FTR: 402. (morti, ) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

#16

(#16) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Taylor, Winslow) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

#15

(#15) Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Taylor, Winslow) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by James Jude Peters on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney James Jude Peters added to party John Coder(pty:pla), Attorney James Jude Peters added to party Norma Coder(pty:pla) (Peters, James) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Richard P. Poormon on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Richard P. Poormon added to party John Coder(pty:pla), Attorney Richard P. Poormon added to party Norma Coder(pty:pla) (Poormon, Richard) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #3 Complaint and Jury Demand by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company.(Henkel, Kurt) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 6/24/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Proposed Scheduling Order due 6/17/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 5/5/2020. (jgonz, ) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

#8

(#8) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-1237-PAB (angar, ) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Winslow Russell Taylor, III on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance CompanyAttorney Winslow Russell Taylor, III added to party Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Taylor, Winslow) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

#6

(#6) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (alave, ) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Civil Summons and Civil Complaint and Jury Demand upon Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company on 03/31/2020. (alave, ) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, filed by John Coder, Norma Coder.(alave, ) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company from Jefferson County District, Case Number 2020CV30453. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7278128), filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Henkel, Kurt) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 6/24/2020. (morti, ) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MINUTE ENTRY for Telephonic Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 6/24/2020. Discovery due by 3/19/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 4/23/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/16/2021 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. FTR: 402. (morti, ) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2020
  • Docket(#17) MINUTE ORDER Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 6/24/2020 at 10:00 AM is VACATED and RESET for 6/24/2020 09:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. If the reset date and time do not work for either party, the parties shall jointly call chambers at 303.335.2365 to reschedule the conference to a more convenient date. The parties shall participate in the conference by calling 888.808.6929 at the scheduled time and utilizing access code: 2805116#. The Court notes that the parties may hear the conclusion of a prior hearing at the time they call in, and are instructed to simply wait until their case is called. The Court apologizes for any inconvenience and thanks the parties in advance for their flexibility. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 6/21/2020. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, ) (Entered: 06/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Taylor, Winslow) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Taylor, Winslow) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • Docket(#14) MINUTE ORDER The parties shall participate in the Scheduling Conference set for 6/24/2020 10:00 AM TELEPHONICALLY by calling 888.808.6929 at the scheduled time and utilizing access code: 2805116#. The Court notes that the parties may hear the conclusion of a prior hearing at the time they call in, and are instructed to simply wait until their case is called. The Court thanks the parties in advance for their patience and flexibility as the Court implements this new technology. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 6/15/2020. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, ) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by James Jude Peters on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney James Jude Peters added to party John Coder(pty:pla), Attorney James Jude Peters added to party Norma Coder(pty:pla) (Peters, James) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Richard P. Poormon on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Richard P. Poormon added to party John Coder(pty:pla), Attorney Richard P. Poormon added to party Norma Coder(pty:pla) (Poormon, Richard) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #3 Complaint and Jury Demand by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company.(Henkel, Kurt) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 6/24/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Proposed Scheduling Order due 6/17/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 5/5/2020. (jgonz, ) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/5/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-1237-PAB (angar, ) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Winslow Russell Taylor, III on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance CompanyAttorney Winslow Russell Taylor, III added to party Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Taylor, Winslow) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (alave, ) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (alave, ) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Civil Summons and Civil Complaint and Jury Demand upon Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company on 03/31/2020. (alave, ) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, filed by John Coder, Norma Coder.(alave, ) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • Docket(#2) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (alave, ) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company from Jefferson County District, Case Number 2020CV30453. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7278128), filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Henkel, Kurt) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Winslow Russell Taylor, III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kurt Hans Henkel