This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:32:55 (UTC).

Code et al v. Vail Resorts, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Code filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Vail Resorts, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert C. Jones, William G. Cobb and Carla Baldwin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00728

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert C. Jones

Referral Judges

William G. Cobb

Carla Baldwin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Steven E. Kroll

Ronald L Code

Defendant

Vail Resorts, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Steven Edward Kroll

Attorney at Law Office of Seven E. Kroll

550 Gonowabie Rd., P.O. Box 8

Crystal Bay, NV 89402

Defendant Attorney

Josephine Groh

Attorney at Weinberg Wheeler Hudgins Gunn & Dial

6385 S. Rainbow Blvd., Suite 400

Las Vegas, NV 89118

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) REPLY to Response to #8 Motion to Dismiss,, by Defendant Vail Resorts, Inc.. (Groh, Josephine) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#15

(#15) EXHIBIT 4 to #11 Response by Plaintiffs Ronald L Code, Steven E. Kroll. (Kroll, Steven) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

#14

(#14) EXHIBIT 3 to #11 Response by Plaintiffs Ronald L Code, Steven E. Kroll. (Kroll, Steven) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

#13

(#13) EXHIBIT 2 to #11 Response by Plaintiffs Ronald L Code, Steven E. Kroll. (Kroll, Steven) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

#12

(#12) EXHIBIT 1 to #11 Response by Plaintiffs Ronald L Code, Steven E. Kroll. (Kroll, Steven) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

#11

(#11) RESPONSE to #8 Motion to Dismiss,, by Plaintiffs Ronald L Code, Steven E. Kroll. Replies due by 1/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index) (Kroll, Steven) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

8 #2

Exhibit

8 #1

Exhibit

#8

(#10) NOTICE of Docket Correction to #8 Motion to Dismiss,, : QC changed event from answer to motion. The title of the document states Motion to Dismiss. (no image attached) (LE) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

7 #2

Certificate of Service Rejection of Service

7 #1

Certificate of Service in Nevada

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronald L Code, Steven E. Kroll re #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, #6 Summons Returned Executed. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service in Nevada, #2 Certificate of Service Rejection of Service) (Kroll, Steven) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#6

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronald L Code, Steven E. Kroll re #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, #6 Summons Returned Executed. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service in Nevada, #2 Certificate of Service Rejection of Service) (Kroll, Steven) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ronald L Code, Steven E. Kroll. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kroll, Steven) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#2

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronald L Code, Steven E. Kroll re #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, #6 Summons Returned Executed. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service in Nevada, #2 Certificate of Service Rejection of Service) (Kroll, Steven) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#8) Motion to Dismiss ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Vail Resorts, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Groh, Josephine) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified event to reflect a motion on 1/17/2020 (LE). (Entered: 01/17/2020)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) REPLY to Response to #8 Motion to Dismiss,, by Defendant Vail Resorts, Inc.. (Groh, Josephine) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to #11 Response, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 . Attorney Steven Edward Kroll advised to review Local Rule LR IA 10-3 and file all future exhibits as attachments/exhibits to the filed document. Exhibits (ECF Nos. 12 -17) should have been filed as attachments/exhibits to the Response ECF No. 11. (no image attached) (LE) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) EXHIBIT 6 to #11 Response by Plaintiffs Ronald L Code, Steven E. Kroll. (Kroll, Steven) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) EXHIBIT 5 to #11 Response by Plaintiffs Ronald L Code, Steven E. Kroll. (Kroll, Steven) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) EXHIBIT 4 to #11 Response by Plaintiffs Ronald L Code, Steven E. Kroll. (Kroll, Steven) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) EXHIBIT 3 to #11 Response by Plaintiffs Ronald L Code, Steven E. Kroll. (Kroll, Steven) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) EXHIBIT 2 to #11 Response by Plaintiffs Ronald L Code, Steven E. Kroll. (Kroll, Steven) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) EXHIBIT 1 to #11 Response by Plaintiffs Ronald L Code, Steven E. Kroll. (Kroll, Steven) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE to #8 Motion to Dismiss,, by Plaintiffs Ronald L Code, Steven E. Kroll. Replies due by 1/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index) (Kroll, Steven) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Docket Correction to #8 Motion to Dismiss,, : QC changed event from answer to motion. The title of the document states Motion to Dismiss. (no image attached) (LE) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Vail Resorts, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc., Other Affiliate Trimont Land Company, Other Affiliate The Vail Corporation d/b/a Vail Resorts Management Company for Vail Resorts, Inc. added. (Groh, Josephine) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Motion to Dismiss ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Vail Resorts, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Groh, Josephine) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified event to reflect a motion on 1/17/2020 (LE). (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronald L Code, Steven E. Kroll re #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, #6 Summons Returned Executed. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service in Nevada, #2 Certificate of Service Rejection of Service) (Kroll, Steven) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronald L Code, Steven E. Kroll re #1 Complaint,. Vail Resorts, Inc. served on 12/27/2019. (Kroll, Steven) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ronald L Code, Steven E. Kroll. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kroll, Steven) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docket(#4) CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin for all further proceedings consistent to her jurisdiction. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:19-cv-00728-RCJ-CLB. (no image attached) (LE) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 1/6/2020. By Deputy Clerk: Lesa Ettinger. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb recuses himself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Vail Resorts, Inc.. (DRM) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to District Judge Robert C. Jones and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (LE) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Vail Resorts, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5802566) by Ronald L Code. Proof of service due by 3/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kroll, Steven) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less