This case was last updated from PACER on 01/20/2020 at 09:43:53 (UTC).

COCKERHAM et al v. MONSANTO COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 11/21/2019 COCKERHAM filed a Property - Real Property Product Liability lawsuit against MONSANTO COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are N. C. TILLEY, JR and JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01153

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Real Property Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

N. C. TILLEY, JR

Referral Judge

JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Juanita Cockerham

Elkin, NC 28621

Amaj Cockerham

Defendants

BAYER AG

BAYER CORPORATION

MONSANTO COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOEL M. BONDURANT, JR.

Attorney at BONDURANT LAW FIRM

11330 Vanstory Drive

Huntersville, NC 28078

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) MDL TRANFER LETTER to individual courts and counsel of record re: Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-171) transferring this action to the Northern District of California. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#3

(#3) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-171) Re: MDL 2741 transferring this action to the NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA for the reasons stated in the order of October 3, 2016. Received and filed on 12/11/2019. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2700793), filed by AMAJ COCKERHAM, JUANITA CICKERHAM. (BONDURANT, JOEL) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MDL TRANFER LETTER to individual courts and counsel of record re: Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-171) transferring this action to the Northern District of California. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-171) Re: MDL 2741 transferring this action to the NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA for the reasons stated in the order of October 3, 2016. Received and filed on 12/11/2019. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2700793), filed by AMAJ COCKERHAM, JUANITA CICKERHAM. (BONDURANT, JOEL) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less