This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/14/2023 at 09:12:18 (UTC).

Cobblestone Wireless, LLC v. VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC., et al

Case Summary

On 12/16/2022 Cobblestone Wireless, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC ,. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodney Gilstrap and Roy S. Payne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00478

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

Referral Judge

Roy S. Payne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cobblestone Wireless, LLC

Defendants

VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC.,

Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Reza Mirzaie

Christian W Conkle

Jonathan Ma

Marc A Fenster

Neil Alan Rubin

Defendant Attorney

Deron R Dacus

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues with the LEAD CASE, Case No. 2:22-cv-00477. All parties are instructed to file any future filings in the LEAD CASE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/6/2023. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

#13

(#13) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC.,.( Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cobblestone Wireless, LLC. VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC., served on 12/20/2022, answer due 1/10/2023. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 12/23/2022)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cobblestone Wireless, LLC. Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless served on 12/20/2022, answer due 1/10/2023. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 12/23/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Neil Alan Rubin on behalf of Cobblestone Wireless, LLC (Rubin, Neil) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Ma on behalf of Cobblestone Wireless, LLC (Ma, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christian W Conkle on behalf of Cobblestone Wireless, LLC (Conkle, Christian) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marc A Fenster on behalf of Cobblestone Wireless, LLC (Fenster, Marc) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

6 #1

Summons(es) VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC.

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) NOTICE by Cobblestone Wireless, LLC NOTICE OF RELATED CASES (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

#4

(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

#3

(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Cobblestone Wireless, LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cobblestone Wireless, LLC (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #1

Main Document

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues with the LEAD CASE, Case No. 2:22-cv-00477. All parties are instructed to file any future filings in the LEAD CASE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/6/2023. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless to 2/24/2023; VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC., to 2/24/2023. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC.,.( Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cobblestone Wireless, LLC. VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC., served on 12/20/2022, answer due 1/10/2023. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 12/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cobblestone Wireless, LLC. Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless served on 12/20/2022, answer due 1/10/2023. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 12/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Neil Alan Rubin on behalf of Cobblestone Wireless, LLC (Rubin, Neil) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Ma on behalf of Cobblestone Wireless, LLC (Ma, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christian W Conkle on behalf of Cobblestone Wireless, LLC (Conkle, Christian) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marc A Fenster on behalf of Cobblestone Wireless, LLC (Fenster, Marc) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Issued as to Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless The Corporation Trust Company Corporation Trust Center, VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC., The Corporation Trust Company Corporation Trust Center. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC.)(nkl, ) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by Cobblestone Wireless, LLC NOTICE OF RELATED CASES (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Cobblestone Wireless, LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cobblestone Wireless, LLC (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC., ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9274891.), filed by Cobblestone Wireless, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less