This case was last updated from PACER on 07/04/2019 at 13:13:53 (UTC).

Cobble v. The State of Georgia

Case Summary

On 05/02/2019 Cobble filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against The State of Georgia. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan K Lee and Travis R McDonough. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00132

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Susan K Lee

Presiding Judge

Travis R McDonough

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Daniel Eric Cobble

Americus, GA 31709

Daniel Castleberry

Americus, GA 31719

Defendant

The State of Georgia

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) ORDER denying #16 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/2/2019. (SAC)Order mailed to Cobble. (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#18

(#18) USCA Case Number 19-5631 for #15 Notice of Appeal filed by Daniel Eric Cobble. (SAC) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

17 #1

Other Envelope

#17

(#17) MOTION to Reopen Case by Daniel Eric Cobble. (Attachments: #1 Other Envelope)(CNC) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

16 #1

Other Envelope

#16

(#16) MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Daniel Eric Cobble. (Attachments: #1 Other Envelope)(CNC) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

15 #1

Other Envelope

#15

(#15) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #13 Judgment, by Daniel Eric Cobble. (Attachments: #1 Other Envelope)(CNC) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#13

(#13) JUDGMENT ORDER dismissing without prejudice #2 Complaint. Plaintiff is REFERRED to Chief Judge Pamela R. Reeves for review and determination of whether an injunction is appropriate pursuant to Standing Order 18-04. Clerk is DIRECTED to close the file. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 5/28/2019. (AML) Mailed to Daniel Cobble aka Castelberry (Entered: 05/29/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER of Assignment. Create association to 1:18-cv-00171-TRM-SKL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 5/10/2019. (AML) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

#5

(#5) Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address (BJL)*Mailed to Daniel Eric Cobble. (Entered: 05/03/2019)

4 #1

Other Envelope

#4

(#12) MEMORANDUM OPINION denying #4 Motion ; denying #9 Motion ; denying #10 Motion ; denying #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #3 Motion. Plaintiff must prepay the entire $400.00 filing fee to proceed in this action. Pursuant to Standing Order 18-04, Plaintiff Daniel Eric Cobble (also known as Daniel Castleberry) is hereby REFERRED to Chief Judge Pamela L. Reeves for review and determination of whether an injunction is appropriate based on Plaintiffs repetitive and frivolous litigation in this District. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 5/28/2019. (AML) Mailed to Daniel Cobble aka Daniel Castleberry (Entered: 05/29/2019)

3 #1

Other Envelope

#3

(#12) MEMORANDUM OPINION denying #4 Motion ; denying #9 Motion ; denying #10 Motion ; denying #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #3 Motion. Plaintiff must prepay the entire $400.00 filing fee to proceed in this action. Pursuant to Standing Order 18-04, Plaintiff Daniel Eric Cobble (also known as Daniel Castleberry) is hereby REFERRED to Chief Judge Pamela L. Reeves for review and determination of whether an injunction is appropriate based on Plaintiffs repetitive and frivolous litigation in this District. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 5/28/2019. (AML) Mailed to Daniel Cobble aka Daniel Castleberry (Entered: 05/29/2019)

#2

(#13) JUDGMENT ORDER dismissing without prejudice #2 Complaint. Plaintiff is REFERRED to Chief Judge Pamela R. Reeves for review and determination of whether an injunction is appropriate pursuant to Standing Order 18-04. Clerk is DIRECTED to close the file. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 5/28/2019. (AML) Mailed to Daniel Cobble aka Castelberry (Entered: 05/29/2019)

1 #1

Other Envelope

#1

(#12) MEMORANDUM OPINION denying #4 Motion ; denying #9 Motion ; denying #10 Motion ; denying #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #3 Motion. Plaintiff must prepay the entire $400.00 filing fee to proceed in this action. Pursuant to Standing Order 18-04, Plaintiff Daniel Eric Cobble (also known as Daniel Castleberry) is hereby REFERRED to Chief Judge Pamela L. Reeves for review and determination of whether an injunction is appropriate based on Plaintiffs repetitive and frivolous litigation in this District. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 5/28/2019. (AML) Mailed to Daniel Cobble aka Daniel Castleberry (Entered: 05/29/2019)

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER denying #16 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/2/2019. (SAC)Order mailed to Cobble. (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) USCA Case Number 19-5631 for #15 Notice of Appeal filed by Daniel Eric Cobble. (SAC) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MOTION to Reopen Case by Daniel Eric Cobble. (Attachments: #1 Other Envelope)(CNC) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Daniel Eric Cobble. (Attachments: #1 Other Envelope)(CNC) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #13 Judgment, by Daniel Eric Cobble. (Attachments: #1 Other Envelope)(CNC) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Case transferred to District of Middle District of Georgia. (AML) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) FILED IN ERROR - CORRECT CASE IS 1:19-cv-62MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. It is ORDERED that this case is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Georgia pursuant to Title 28, United States Code, Section 1406(a). Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 5/28/2019. (AML) Mailed to Daniel Cobble aka Castleberry Modified on 5/29/2019 (AML). (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) JUDGMENT ORDER dismissing without prejudice #2 Complaint. Plaintiff is REFERRED to Chief Judge Pamela R. Reeves for review and determination of whether an injunction is appropriate pursuant to Standing Order 18-04. Clerk is DIRECTED to close the file. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 5/28/2019. (AML) Mailed to Daniel Cobble aka Castelberry (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MEMORANDUM OPINION denying #4 Motion ; denying #9 Motion ; denying #10 Motion ; denying #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #3 Motion. Plaintiff must prepay the entire $400.00 filing fee to proceed in this action. Pursuant to Standing Order 18-04, Plaintiff Daniel Eric Cobble (also known as Daniel Castleberry) is hereby REFERRED to Chief Judge Pamela L. Reeves for review and determination of whether an injunction is appropriate based on Plaintiffs repetitive and frivolous litigation in this District. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 5/28/2019. (AML) Mailed to Daniel Cobble aka Daniel Castleberry (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) OBJECTION by Plaintiff Daniel Eric Cobble, Petitioner Daniel Eric Cobble to Order Assigning Cases. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AML) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: It is therefore ORDERED that to more efficiently utilize the Courts time and resources, case styled Daniel Eric Cobble vs. U.S. Attorney General, et. al., Case No. 1:19-cv-62-HSM-SKL and case styled Daniel Eric Cobble vs. The State of Georgia, et. al., Case No.: 1:19-cv-132-HSM-SKL, are hereby REASSIGNED to United States District Judge Harry S. Mattice. United States Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee is currently assigned to both of these cases and will continue to handle any matters routinely considered by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b) and the Rules of this Court. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 5/14/19. (ABF) Modified on 5/14/2019 to indicate c/m to Daniel Eric Cobble, SUMTER COUNTY JAIL, 352 McMath Mill Rd., Americus, GA 31709 (ABF). (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee and District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr no longer assigned to case. Previous case assignment made in error. See Order of Assignment (doc. 6). (GRE) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER of Assignment. Create association to 1:18-cv-00171-TRM-SKL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 5/10/2019. (AML) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (AML) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • An email has been sent to Judge Lee's chambers to notify that this case may be related to 1:18-cv-308-TRM-SKL. (BJL) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address (BJL)*Mailed to Daniel Eric Cobble. (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for the Court by Daniel Eric Cobble. (BJL, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/3/2019: #1 Other Envelope) (BJL). (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Diversity by Daniel Eric Cobble. (BJL, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/3/2019: #1 Other Envelope) (BJL). (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against The State of Georgia, filed by Daniel Eric Cobble.(BJL) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Daniel Eric Cobble. (*not signed) (BJL, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/3/2019: #1 Other Envelope) (BJL). Modified on 5/3/2019 (BJL). (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less