This case was last updated from PACER on 05/26/2020 at 08:44:29 (UTC).

Cobble v. Midland Credit Management, Inc. (TV1)

Case Summary

On 03/27/2020 Cobble filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Midland Credit Management, Inc TV1. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cynthia R Wyrick and Thomas A Varlan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00056

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Cynthia R Wyrick

Presiding Judge

Thomas A Varlan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zachary Cobble

Defendant

Midland Credit Management, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alan C Lee

Attorney at Alan C. Lee, Attorney

Post Office Box 1357

Talbott, TN 37877-1357

Defendant Attorney

Robert Franklin Springfield

Attorney at Burr & Forman LLP (Birmingham)

420 North 20Th Street, Suite 3400

Birmingham, AL 35203-5206

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Midland Credit Management, Inc. (Springfield, Robert) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

11 #1

Other Notice of Consent / Non Consent

#11

(#11) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 04/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent / Non Consent) (CAT) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

#10

(#10) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Midland Credit Management, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Encore Capital Group, Inc. for Midland Credit Management, Inc.. (Springfield, Robert) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Midland Credit Management, Inc..(Springfield, Robert) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zachary Cobble. Midland Credit Management, Inc. served on 4/3/2020. (Lee, Alan) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

#7

(#7) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint, by Zachary Cobble. (Lee, Alan) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

#6

(#6) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 03/30/2020. (CAT) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

#5

(#5) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 03/30/2020. (CAT) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 03/30/2020. (CAT) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

#3

(#3) Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint : Please refile Exhibit 1 as a Supplement and link it back to the Complaint. Requirements due by 4/6/2020. (CAT) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Midland Credit Management, Inc. (CAT) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

1 #3

Summons - Midland

1 #2

Other Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Civil Summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Midland Credit Management, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4285596.), filed by Zachary Cobble. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Civil Summons, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - Midland)(Lee, Alan) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Midland Credit Management, Inc. (Springfield, Robert) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 04/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent / Non Consent) (CAT) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Midland Credit Management, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Encore Capital Group, Inc. for Midland Credit Management, Inc.. (Springfield, Robert) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Midland Credit Management, Inc..(Springfield, Robert) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zachary Cobble. Midland Credit Management, Inc. served on 4/3/2020. (Lee, Alan) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint, by Zachary Cobble. (Lee, Alan) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 03/30/2020. (CAT) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 03/30/2020. (CAT) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 03/30/2020. (CAT) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint : Please refile Exhibit 1 as a Supplement and link it back to the Complaint. Requirements due by 4/6/2020. (CAT) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Midland Credit Management, Inc. (CAT) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketDistrict Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick added. (CAT) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Midland Credit Management, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4285596.), filed by Zachary Cobble. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Civil Summons, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - Midland)(Lee, Alan) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less