This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/20/2020 at 09:10:29 (UTC).

Cobb v. McMaster et al

Case Summary

On 08/21/2020 Cobb filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against McMaster. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are Shiva V Hodges and J Michelle Childs. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03024

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Shiva V Hodges

Presiding Judge

J Michelle Childs

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tracy Lee Cobb

Kershaw, SC 29067

Defendants

Governor Henry McMaster

SCDOC Director Bryan P. Stirling

Dr. April Clark

SCDOC Warden Terrie Wallace

Terrie Wallace

Bryan Stirling

April Clark

Henry McMaster

 

Court Documents

14 #1

Envelope

#14

(#14) AMENDED COMPLAINT against April Clark, Henry McMaster, Bryan Stirling, Terrie Wallace, filed by Tracy Lee Cobb. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lbak) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

#12

(#12) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending the district judge dismiss the #1 complaint with prejudice and without issuance and service of process. Objections to R&R due by 10/6/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 9/22/2020. (lbak) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

9 #1

Envelope

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Change of Address by Tracy Lee Cobb. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lbak) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER AND NOTICE Plaintiff may attempt to correct the defects in his #1 complaint by filing an amended complaint by September 15, 2020, along with any appropriate service documents. Plaintiff is reminded an amended complaint replaces the original complaint and should be complete in itself. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint or fails to cure the deficiencies identified above, the undersigned will recommend to the district court that the claims be dismissed without leave for further amendment. (Specific Document due by 9/15/2020.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 9/1/2020. (lbak) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#6

(#6) PROPER FORM ORDER (Case to be brought into proper form by 9/22/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.) Motion granted: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 9/1/2020. (lbak) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

1 #3

Envelope 3

1 #2

Envelope 2

1 #1

Envelope 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against April Clark, Henry McMaster, Bryan P. Stirling, Terrie Wallace, filed by Tracy Lee Cobb. (Attachments: #1 Envelope 1, #2 Envelope 2, #3 Envelope 3) (lbak) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) AMENDED COMPLAINT against April Clark, Henry McMaster, Bryan Stirling, Terrie Wallace, filed by Tracy Lee Cobb. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lbak) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ***DOCUMENT MAILED #12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Tracy Lee Cobb, 333826, KCI, 4848 Goldmine Hwy., Kershaw, SC 29067. (lbak) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending the district judge dismiss the #1 complaint with prejudice and without issuance and service of process. Objections to R&R due by 10/6/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 9/22/2020. (lbak) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #6 Proper Form Order, #7 Order and standard complaint form placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Tracy Lee Cobb, 333826, KCI, 4848 Goldmine Hwy, Kershaw, SC 29067. (lbak) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Change of Address by Tracy Lee Cobb. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lbak) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #6 Proper Form Order, #7 Order and standard complaint form placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Tracy Lee Cobb, 333826, Kirkland Correctional Institution R&E, 4344 Broad River Road, Columbia, SC 29210. (lbak/ahil) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER AND NOTICE Plaintiff may attempt to correct the defects in his #1 complaint by filing an amended complaint by September 15, 2020, along with any appropriate service documents. Plaintiff is reminded an amended complaint replaces the original complaint and should be complete in itself. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint or fails to cure the deficiencies identified above, the undersigned will recommend to the district court that the claims be dismissed without leave for further amendment. (Specific Document due by 9/15/2020.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 9/1/2020. (lbak) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PROPER FORM ORDER (Case to be brought into proper form by 9/22/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.) Motion granted: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 9/1/2020. (lbak) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • Docket(#4) TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Columbia. (lbak) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Tracy Lee Cobb. Response to Motion due by 9/4/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Financial Certificate, #2 Envelope 1, #3 Envelope 2, #4 Envelope 3) Motions referred to Shiva V. Hodges. (lbak) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against April Clark, Henry McMaster, Bryan P. Stirling, Terrie Wallace, filed by Tracy Lee Cobb. (Attachments: #1 Envelope 1, #2 Envelope 2, #3 Envelope 3) (lbak) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Governor Henry McMaster is a litigant