This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/10/2022 at 11:51:22 (UTC).

Cobb v. CVS Health Corporation

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 Cobb filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against CVS Health Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are James S. Moody, Jr and Amanda Arnold Sansone. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-CV-00114

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James S. Moody, Jr

Referral Judge

Amanda Arnold Sansone

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and In Re

Nicole Cobb

Melanie Burpee

Nicole Giardinelli

Defendants

CVS Health Corporation doing business as CVS Caremark

CVS Health Corporation a Foreign Corporation doing business as CVS Caremark

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen H. Haskins

Attorney at Lucas | Magazine, PLLC

8606 Government Dr

New Port Richey, FL 34654

Defendant Attorneys

Donna K. Hanes

Attorney at Wicker Smith,

100 South Ashley Street, Suite 1800

Tampa, FL 33602

Erin M. Diaz

Attorney at Wicker, Smith, O'Hara, McCoy & Ford, PA

100 N Tampa St Ste 1800

Tampa, FL 33602-5810

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER: Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Remand to State Court (Dkt. #12) is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to remand this case to the Thirteenth Judicial Circuit in and for Hillsborough County, Florida. The Clerk is also directed to forward a certified copy of this Order to that Court. The Clerk is directed to CLOSE this file and terminate any pending motions as moot. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 2/15/2022. (SMB) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

#12

(#12) Unopposed MOTION to Remand to State Court by CVS Health Corporation. (Hanes, Donna) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Firm Name Change and Amended Designation of E-Mail Address by Melanie Burpee. (Haskins, Stephen) Modified on 2/7/2022 to edit text (CRK). (Entered: 02/07/2022)

9 #1

Exhibit 1

#9

(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CVS Health Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hanes, Donna) Modified on 2/2/2022 to edit text (CRK). (Entered: 02/01/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Melanie Burpee. Related case(s): Yes (Haskins, Stephen) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by CVS Health Corporation. Related case(s): No (Hanes, Donna) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KAC) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

4 #2

State Court Other Documents

4 #1

State Court Docket Sheet

#4

(#4) NOTICE by CVS Health Corporation of Filing State Court Docket Sheet and State Court Records (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket Sheet, #2 State Court Other Documents)(Hanes, Donna) Modified on 1/14/2022 to edit text (BD). (Entered: 01/14/2022)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hillsborough County, case number 21-CA-9585 filed in State Court on January 13, 2022. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-19121139 filed by CVS Health Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complaint, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hanes, Donna) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/14/2022: #4 Amended Complaint) (BD). Modified on 1/14/2022 to correct docket text and attachment (BD). (Entered: 01/13/2022)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER: Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Remand to State Court (Dkt. #12) is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to remand this case to the Thirteenth Judicial Circuit in and for Hillsborough County, Florida. The Clerk is also directed to forward a certified copy of this Order to that Court. The Clerk is directed to CLOSE this file and terminate any pending motions as moot. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 2/15/2022. (SMB) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Unopposed MOTION to Remand to State Court by CVS Health Corporation. (Hanes, Donna) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Firm Name Change and Amended Designation of E-Mail Address by Melanie Burpee. (Haskins, Stephen) Modified on 2/7/2022 to edit text (CRK). (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's deadline to respond to the Amended Complaint is extended to March 8, 2022. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 2/2/2022. (SMB) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CVS Health Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hanes, Donna) Modified on 2/2/2022 to edit text (CRK). (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Melanie Burpee. Related case(s): Yes (Haskins, Stephen) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by CVS Health Corporation. Related case(s): No (Hanes, Donna) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KAC) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KAC) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by CVS Health Corporation of Filing State Court Docket Sheet and State Court Records (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket Sheet, #2 State Court Other Documents)(Hanes, Donna) Modified on 1/14/2022 to edit text (BD). (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:22-cv-0114-JSM-AAS. (SJB) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hillsborough County, case number 21-CA-9585 filed in State Court on January 13, 2022. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-19121139 filed by CVS Health Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complaint, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hanes, Donna) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/14/2022: #4 Amended Complaint) (BD). Modified on 1/14/2022 to correct docket text and attachment (BD). (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CVS Health Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Erin Moss Diaz