This case was last updated from PACER on 07/31/2020 at 14:56:39 (UTC).

Coastal Transportation Inc v. Golden Harvest Alaska Seafood LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/01/2020 Coastal Transportation Inc filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against Golden Harvest Alaska Seafood LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert S. Lasnik. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00830

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert S. Lasnik

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Coastal Transportation, Inc.

Coastal Transportation Inc

Defendants

Golden Harvest Alaska Seafood LLC

Geoff Hewitt Hartley

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John E. Casperson

Attorney at HOLMES WEDDLE & BARCOTT

3101 Western Ave Ste 500

Seattle, WA 98121-3071

Lafcadio H Darling

Attorney at HOLMES WEDDLE & BARCOTT

3101 Western Ave Ste 500

Seattle, WA 98121-3071

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Geoff Hewitt Hartley on 6/7/2020, filed by Plaintiff Coastal Transportation Inc. (Casperson, John) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Golden Harvest Alaska Seafood LLC on 6/4/2020, filed by Plaintiff Coastal Transportation Inc. (Casperson, John) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

3 #1

Summons

#3

(#3) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Golden Harvest Alaska Seafood LLC, Geoff Hewitt Hartley (Attachments: #1 Summons)(CDA) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Coastal Transportation, Inc. (Casperson, John) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

1 #13

Summons Geoff Hewitt Hartley

1 #12

Summons Golden Harvest Alaska Seafood LLC

1 #11

Exhibit 10

1 #10

Exhibit 9

1 #9

Exhibit 8

1 #8

Exhibit 7

1 #7

Exhibit 6

1 #6

Exhibit 5

1 #5

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Golden Harvest Alaska Seafood LLC, Geoff Hewitt Hartley (Receipt # AWAWDC-6373386) Attorney John E. Casperson added to party Coastal Transportation, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Coastal Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Summons Golden Harvest Alaska Seafood LLC, #13 Summons Geoff Hewitt Hartley)(Casperson, John) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Geoff Hewitt Hartley on 6/7/2020, filed by Plaintiff Coastal Transportation Inc. (Casperson, John) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Golden Harvest Alaska Seafood LLC on 6/4/2020, filed by Plaintiff Coastal Transportation Inc. (Casperson, John) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Golden Harvest Alaska Seafood LLC, Geoff Hewitt Hartley (Attachments: #1 Summons)(CDA) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketJudge Robert S. Lasnik added. (CDA) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Coastal Transportation, Inc. (Casperson, John) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Golden Harvest Alaska Seafood LLC, Geoff Hewitt Hartley (Receipt # AWAWDC-6373386) Attorney John E. Casperson added to party Coastal Transportation, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Coastal Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Summons Golden Harvest Alaska Seafood LLC, #13 Summons Geoff Hewitt Hartley)(Casperson, John) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less