This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/18/2021 at 15:35:25 (UTC).

Coastal Point LLC v. Google LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/19/2021 Coastal Point LLC filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Google LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00554

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Coastal Point LLC

Defendants

Google LLC

Facebook, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Peter Bradford deLeeuw

Attorney at deLeeuw Law LLC

1301 Walnut Green Road

Wilmington, DE 19807

Steven M. Jodlowski

David W. Mitchell

Defendant Attorney

David Evan Ross

Attorney at Ross Aronstam & Moritz LLP

100 S. West Street, Suite 400

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter T. Barbur, Kevin J. Orsini, and Vanessa A. Lavely - filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Ross, David) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by David Evan Ross on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (Ross, David) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Coastal Point LLC: For Facebook, Inc. waiver sent on 4/23/2021, answer due 6/22/2021. (deLeeuw, Peter) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Coastal Point LLC: For Google LLC waiver sent on 4/23/2021, answer due 6/22/2021. (deLeeuw, Peter) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney David W. Mitchell, Steven M. Jodlowski for Coastal Point LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven M. Jodlowski filed by Coastal Point LLC, #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David W. Mitchell filed by Coastal Point LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/3/21. (ntl) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven M. Jodlowski - filed by Coastal Point LLC. (deLeeuw, Peter) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David W. Mitchell - filed by Coastal Point LLC. (deLeeuw, Peter) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketNo Summons Issued. (mal) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Facebook, Inc., Google LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3596320.) - filed by Coastal Point LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Google LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Facebook is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Evan Ross